Wade et al v. GPB Capital Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Loch and Victor Wade
Defendant: David Gentile, GPB Holdings II, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, Does 1-100, William Jacoby, GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP and Roger Anscher
Case Number: 1:2019cv07250
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger Anscher. (pne)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roger Anscher, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 6, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Roger Anscher added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Victor Wade, Karen Loch. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Rosen, Adam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Jacoby. (pne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GPB Holdings II, LP. (pne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GPB Capital Holdings, LLC. (pne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP. (pne)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Gentile. (pne)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam L. Rosen to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the party for whom the summons is being requested has not been added to the case; re-file the summons request after adding the party. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam L. Rosen re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Roger Anscher must be added to the case. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pne)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Jacoby, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roger Anscher, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam) Modified on 8/5/2019 (pne).
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Holdings II, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Gentile, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Loch, Victor Wade. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosen, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP, David Gentile, William Jacoby. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17365071)Document filed by Victor Wade, Karen Loch.(Rosen, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade et al v. GPB Capital Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Loch
Represented By: Adam L. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Wade
Represented By: Adam L. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Holdings II, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Capital Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Anscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?