United States of America v. Schwartz
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Michael N Schwartz
Case Number: 1:2019cv07256
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Folch, Monica)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED AND ORDERED that: Defendant admits that the Court has personal jurisdiction over him pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1340 and 1345, and subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 26 U.S.C. 7402(a), 7407(a) and 7408(a). Defendant admits, acknowledges, and accepts responsibility for the following facts: and further set forth in this Order. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this action for purpose of implementingand enforcing the final judgment and any additional orders necessary and appropriate to the public interest. The Parties waive the right to appeal from the Injunction. The Parties understand and agree that this Stipulated Final Judgment ofPermanent Injunction and Order will be entered under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 andwill result in the entry, without further notice, of a Final Judgment in this matter. The Parties understand and agree that the Parties will bear their own costs, including any attorneys' fees or other expenses of this litigation. The Parties further understand and agree that if Defendant violates the Injunction, he may be subject to sanctions for contempt. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/8/2019) (rro)
August 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Monica Pilar Folch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Monica Pilar Folch to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Michael N Schwartz. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Folch, Monica)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Monica Pilar Folch to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must be titled (i.e. Complaint, Petition) Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/12/2019. (jgo)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Folch, Monica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Folch, Monica) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jgo).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Michael N Schwartz. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Folch, Monica) Modified on 8/5/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Monica Pilar Folch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?