Morales v. Carter Burden Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janny Morales
Defendant: Carter Burden Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07361
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carter Burden Network, Inc.. (pne)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Carter Burden Network, Inc., re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Janny Morales. (Jones, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Dean Jones to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): a summons was previously issued to this party; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carter Burden Network, Inc., re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Janny Morales. (Jones, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/16/2019 (pne).
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Carter Burden Network, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Janny Morales. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Jones, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carter Burden Network, Inc.. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carter Burden Network, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Janny Morales. (Jones, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell M Medina on behalf of Janny Morales. (Medina, Mitchell)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Dean Jones. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $300,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $300,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jones, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carter Burden Network, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17385005)Document filed by Janny Morales.(Jones, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Carter Burden Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janny Morales
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Jones
Represented By: Mitchell M Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Burden Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?