Webster v. Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.
Plaintiff: Alexia Webster
Defendant: Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07374
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel that Defendant Jack Shainman Gallery Inc.- N.Y.C. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action by November 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C. answer due 11/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2019) (mml)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.. (Cossu, Paul)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel that Defendant Jack Shainman Gallery Inc. - N.Y.C. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action by October 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc. - N.Y.C. answer due 10/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2019) (mml)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.. (Cossu, Paul)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Cossu on behalf of Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.. (Cossu, Paul)
August 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Document filed by Alexia Webster. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexia Webster. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17388862)Document filed by Alexia Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexia Webster
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Shainman Gallery, Inc.- N.Y.C.
Represented By: Paul Cossu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?