Muniz et al v. Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz, Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo and Marie Fill
Defendant: Paul Lamas, Harry Poulakakos, Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC, Anthony Malone and Peter Poulakakos
Case Number: 1:2019cv07468
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference of November 22nd, 2019 or for leave to appear by telephone. The initial conference in this matter is hereby rescheduled to October 25, 2019 at 3:45 p.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:45 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/13/2019) (jca)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference of November 22nd, 2019 or for leave to appear by telephone addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Colin Mulholland, Esq. dated September 10th, 2019. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz.(Mulholland, Colin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Paul Lamas, Anthony Malone, Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC, Harry Poulakakos, Peter Poulakakos.(Kreger, Wayne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul Lamas, Anthony Malone, Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC, Harry Poulakakos, Peter Poulakakos.(Kreger, Wayne)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Anthony Malone served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jason V.. Document filed by Steven Criollo; Cristian Morales; Cynthia Cabezas Recalde; Octaviano Muniz; Marie Fill. (Mulholland, Colin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul Lamas served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jason V. Document filed by Steven Criollo; Cristian Morales; Cynthia Cabezas Recalde; Octaviano Muniz; Marie Fill. (Mulholland, Colin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Harry Poulakakos served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jason V. Document filed by Steven Criollo; Cristian Morales; Cynthia Cabezas Recalde; Octaviano Muniz; Marie Fill. (Mulholland, Colin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Peter Poulakakos served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jason V. Document filed by Steven Criollo; Cristian Morales; Cynthia Cabezas Recalde; Octaviano Muniz; Marie Fill. (Mulholland, Colin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Steven Criollo; Cristian Morales; Cynthia Cabezas Recalde; Octaviano Muniz; Marie Fill. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2019) (ne)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Malone. (dnh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Lamas. (dnh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Poulakakos. (dnh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harry Poulakakos. (dnh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC. (dnh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Malone, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAUL LAMAS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PETER POULAKAKOS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HARRY POULAKAKOS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PIER A BATTERY PARK ASSOCIATES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Steven Criollo, Marie Fill, Cristian Morales, Octaviano Muniz. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mulholland, Colin)
August 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Colin James Mulholland. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201fl; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Colin James Mulholland. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Lamas, Anthony Malone, Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC, Harry Poulakakos, Peter Poulakakos. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17402175)Document filed by Steven Criollo, Cristian Morales, Cynthia Cabezas Recalde, Octaviano Muniz, Marie Fill.(Mulholland, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz et al v. Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Morales
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octaviano Muniz
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Cabezas Recalde
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Criollo
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Fill
Represented By: Colin James Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lamas
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Poulakakos
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pier A Battery Park Associates, LLC
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Malone
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Poulakakos
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?