Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc. v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC.
Defendant: James H. Jacobs, Harris, N.A. and Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07470
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 cp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Howard J. Schwartz dated October 7, 2019. Document filed by James H. Jacobs.(Schwartz, Howard)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Buttoro, Legal Assistant authorized to accept. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/26/2019) (ama)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. James H. Jacobs served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Howard J. Schwartz, Authorized To Accept. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A.. (jgo)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A., re: #13 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against James H. Jacobs, Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Greenberger, Jordan)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Waiver of Summons served on James Jacobs on 8/22/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Harris, N.A. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Mark Chester, Person Authorized To Accept. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc..(Greenberger, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jordan Daniel Greenberger to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): wrong case number (case year) indicated on document. (ldi)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harris, N.A.. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James H. Jacobs. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan Daniel Greenberger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Harris, N.A., James H. Jacobs, SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jordan Daniel Greenberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Greenberger, Jordan)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC..(Greenberger, Jordan) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ldi).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James H. Jacobs, as Trustee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harris, N.A., as Trustee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC.. (Greenberger, Jordan)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Greenberger, Jordan)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harris, N.A., James H. Jacobs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17402454)Document filed by SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC..(Greenberger, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sketchworks Industrial Strength Comedy, Inc. v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Jacobs
Represented By: Howard J. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard National Trust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKETCHWORKS INDUSTRIAL STRENGTH COMEDY, INC.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Greenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?