Maines et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelli Maines and Steven Maines
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07525
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER NO.27 MEMORIALIZING SEPTEMBER 26, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court has set a control date of December 12, 2019, at 3 o'clock PM for the next status conference. The conference will occur in Courtroom 14-C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United State Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Counsel should check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. Counsel should arrive at the Courthouse with sufficient time to go through security. Seats in the Courtroom may not be reserved. No later than five (5) days prior to the Status Conference, counsel shall file a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) single-spaced pages and to be filed in both 18-MD-2859 and 18-MC-2859, setting forth the parties' tentative agenda. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/10/2019) ( Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al.(ks)
August 20, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 20, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc.. (dnh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc.. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Kelli Maines, Steven Maines.(Talley, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kelli Maines, Steven Maines. (Talley, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kelli Maines, Steven Maines. (Talley, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kelli Maines, Steven Maines. (Talley, Stuart)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Stuart C. Talley, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stuart C. Talley to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each Summons Request must be filed as a separate event or multiple parties may be listed on one summons request by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stuart C. Talley. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,000,000. (dnh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc.; Zimmer US, Inc.; and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kelli Maines, Steven Maines. (Attachments: #1 Summons Zimmer US, Inc., #2 Summons Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.)(Talley, Stuart) Modified on 8/13/2019 (dnh).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Talley, Stuart)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17412994)Document filed by Steven Maines, Kelli Maines.(Talley, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maines et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Maines
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Maines
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?