Jansen v. International Flavors & Fragrances Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marc Jansen
Defendant: Andreas Fibig, Richard A. OLeary, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc. and Richard A. O'Leary
Case Number: 1:2019cv07536
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, subject to approval by the Court, as follows: Counsel for defendant International Flavors & Fragrances Inc. shall accept service for the individual defendants Andreas Fibig and Richard A. O'Leary. Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Initial Complaint, and hereby are expressly relieved from answering or otherwise responding to the Initial Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the entry of an Order appointing lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel in the above-captioned action (or a consolidated action encompassing the above-captioned action) pursuant to the PSLRA, the Parties will confer and submit a proposed schedule, subject to the approval of the Court, for the filing of an amended complaint and Defendants' response thereto. There have been no requests for an extension of time previously made in this matter. Nothing in this stipulation shall be construed as a waiver of any defenses or rights available to parties (other than with respect to service of process). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/16/2019) (ama)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Eve Kotler on behalf of Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. O'Leary. (Kotler, Meredith)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Vicens on behalf of Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. O'Leary. (Vicens, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger Allen Cooper on behalf of Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. O'Leary. (Cooper, Roger)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. O'Leary. (Cooper, Roger)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. O'Leary. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marc Jansen; Richard A. O'Leary. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (sj)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., ANDREAS FIBIG, and RICHARD A. O'LEARY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marc Jansen. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andreas Fibig, International Flavors & Fragrances Inc., Richard A. OLeary. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17415436)Document filed by Marc Jansen.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jansen v. International Flavors & Fragrances Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Jansen
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Fibig
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. OLeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Flavors & Fragrances Inc.
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. O'Leary
Represented By: Roger Allen Cooper
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?