Barbera v. Alexander Wang Incorporated
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Defendant: Alexander Wang Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv07540
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Alexander Wang Incorporated answer due 10/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/4/2019) (rro)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Alissa F. Bard dated October 3, 2019. Document filed by Alexander Wang Incorporated.(Friedman, Alissa)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Alexander Wang Incorporated answer due 10/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/4/2019) (kv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Alissa F. Bard dated September 3, 2019. Document filed by Alexander Wang Incorporated.(Friedman, Alissa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alissa Gail Friedman on behalf of Alexander Wang Incorporated. (Friedman, Alissa)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/28/2019) (cf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexander Wang Incorporated. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
August 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexander Wang Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Wang Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17415501)Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbera v. Alexander Wang Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Wang Incorporated
Represented By: Alissa Gail Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?