Smith v. Time Out America LLC
Plaintiff: Byron Smith
Defendant: Time Out America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07580
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Time Out America LLC.(Zibas, Jura)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen James Barrett on behalf of Time Out America LLC. (Barrett, Stephen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jura Christine Zibas on behalf of Time Out America LLC. (Zibas, Jura)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Time Out America LLC answer due 9/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/4/2019) (jca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Stephen J. Barrett dated September 3, 2019. Document filed by Time Out America LLC.(Barrett, Stephen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen James Barrett on behalf of Time Out America LLC. (Barrett, Stephen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jura Christine Zibas on behalf of Time Out America LLC. (Zibas, Jura)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/16/2019) (jca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Time Out America LLC. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
August 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Time Out America LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Byron Smith. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Time Out America LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17423310)Document filed by Byron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Time Out America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Smith
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Out America LLC
Represented By: Jura Christine Zibas
Represented By: Stephen James Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?