Vanderwerff v. Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: James Vanderwerff
Defendant: Michael Beaman, Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc.,, Quincy Bioscience Manufacturing, LLC, Prevagen, Inc., Mark Underwood and Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07582
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 14, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19cv3521 and declined by Judge Luis L. Stanton and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
August 14, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Louis L. Stanton as possibly related to 1:19-cv-3521. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 92 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:17-cv-00784. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 9, 2019 *** Civil Case Terminated *** See #91 Order to Transfer. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order transferring case to District of SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK re #90 Joint Stipulation. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/9/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 90 STIPULATION --Joint Stipulation to Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York)(CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/1/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. (No Court Reporter/Recorder) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Remark: The next conference will proceed via telephone on 7/1/2019 at 2:30 p.m. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request #86 , the Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2019 is adjourned to 7/1/2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T. GRAHAM on behalf of MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD (GRAHAM, GLENN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III on behalf of MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 86 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEWART WELTMAN, ESQ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 85 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stewart Weltman, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to STEWART WELTMAN, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW039441 (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to STEWART WELTMAN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/23/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -Stewart Weltman, Esq.- by JAMES VANDERWERFF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin P. Roddy in Support, #2 Index A - Decl. of Stewart Weltman and Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Stewart Weltman, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 82 BRIEF Defendants' Reply to #79 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/15/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/15/2019. (No Court Reporter/Recorder) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 78 BRIEF Defendants' Supplement Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss #28 (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2019 is adjourned to 4/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 77 Letter from Kevin P. Roddy to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer USMJ. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for 4/4/2019 is adjourned to 4/5/2019 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/2/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 4/3/2019 is adjourned to 4/4/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER ORDER that the parties may submit supplemental briefing according to the following deadlines: Defendants' supplemental brief by 4/5/2019; Plaintiffs opposition by 4/15/2019; and Defendants reply by 4/22/2019. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/18/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference scheduled for today in these matters (this one and 18-12416) is rescheduled to April 3, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant shall kindly initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/19. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 73 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Judge Salas re #51 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/24/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Defendants' #59 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/28/2018. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 71 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/28/2018. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: In light of the fact that a telephone conference call is scheduled in this matter for January 24, 2019, the call previously set for November 21, 2018 is cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/18. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; that Civil Action 2:18-cv-12416-ES-MAH and Civil Action No 2:17-cv-784-ES-MAH shall be consolidated for pre-trial proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/30/2018. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 68 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER: The parties' request made during the October 19, 2018 telephone conference to extend the deadline for responding to written discovery until January 23, 2019 is granted. There will be a telephone conference in this matter on January 24, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Defense counsel will kindly initiate the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/29/2018. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/19/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference on October 19, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. to discuss the parties' letter filed on October 17, 2018 [D.E. 64]. Plaintiff's counsel will kindly initiate the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/18/2018. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 65 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, USMJ (Amended). (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter D.E. #64 submitted by D. Lapinski on 10/17/18 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 64 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, USMJ. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER updating certain deadlines in the 7/26/18 Order (D.E. # 58). The deadline to respond to written discovery is adjourned to 10/23/18. The deadline to file a proposed deposition schedule is adjourned to 11/6/18, etc., re #62 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/1/18. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 62 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, USMJ requesting a brief postponement of two discovery related deadlines re #58 Order,, Set Hearings,. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 61 BRIEF In Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge Hammer's July 26, 2018 Order (Dkt. No. #58 ) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and Local Rule 72.1(c)(1)(A) (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 60 BRIEF In Opposition to Defendants' Appeal from and Objections to Majistrate Judge Hammer's Order Dated July 26, 2018 (Dkt. 59) (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #59 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD re #58 Order,, Set Hearings,. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 59 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD re #58 Order,, Set Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant's Objection to Magistrate Judge Hammer's 7/26/2018 Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, that on or before September 1, 2018, the parties may serve interrogatories limited to twenty-five (25) single questions and requests for production of documents and requests to admit related to class certification, to be responded to within thirty (30) days of receipt. There will be a Telephone Conference on 11/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Plaintiff shall kindly initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/26/18. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 57 Letter from all parties regarding written discovery re 52 Order,,. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Letter requesting a brief postponement of the 6/22/2018 deadline be extended until July 13, 2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 06/25/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 55 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson dated 6/15/2018 addressed to Hon. Michael A. Hammer requesting a brief postponement of the 6/22/2018 deadline re 52 Order,,. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 54 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Esther Salas, USDJ. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 53 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson to the Honorable Esther Salas dated 5/23/2018 re Second Circuit Status. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/22/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the May 22, 2018 telephone conference, the parties will meet and confer on the scope of, and a schedule for, written discovery. On or before June 22, 2018, the parties shall submit either: (1) a jointly proposed scheduling order, or (2) a joint letter setting forth the parties' respective positions on the appropriate scope of written discovery, the reasons for that party's position, and a proposed schedule to complete it. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/22/2018. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING #28 Motion to Dismiss for DOCKET MANAGEMENT PURPOSES ONLY; that Defendants shall file a letter on the Courts ECF System within 7 days of a decision by the Second Circuit on the appeal of the S.D.N.Y. Case and indicate whether they seek to file supplemental briefing; that Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter on the Courts ECF System no later than 7 days after Defendants letter is filed on the Courts ECF System; that nothing in this Order shall be construed to supersede Magistrate Judge Hammers September 1, 2017 Order (see D.E. No. 37); etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/6/18. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/5/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference on May 22, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will kindly initiate the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/5/2018. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 3/5/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/12/18. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 8, 2018 Filing 48 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, USMJ Enclosing a Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Scheduling))(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 47 STATEMENT -Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority by JAMES VANDERWERFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/12/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the December 12, 2017 conference call, on or before January 8, 2018, the parties will submit the joint discovery plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/12/2017. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/23/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference on December 12, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will kindly initiate the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2017. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed plaintiff's letter #43 . The request to adjourn the telephone conference is denied. The conference shall proceed as scheduled on 10/23/2017 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/20/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 43 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer USMJ. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMES VANDERWERFF re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE by All Defendants of Supplemental Authority Supporting Motion to Dismiss (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/14/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.] Modified on 8/14/2019 (sjo).
September 11, 2017 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings of a Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2017, before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2017. (sm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 38 STATEMENT (Discovery Confidentiality Order and Exhibit A by JAMES VANDERWERFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2017. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #27 Motion to Stay; that by September 8, 2017, the parties shall file with the Court their application for the entry of a discovery confidentiality order; there will be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on October 23, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/1/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 36 Joint Discovery Plan by JAMES VANDERWERFF.(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 34 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMES VANDERWERFF re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 33 Letter from Jeffrey Jacobson to Judge Hammer. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/19/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD re #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMES VANDERWERFF re #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 29 Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski, Esq., to the Clerk of the Court. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief /Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of Michael Beaman, #3 Declaration of Mark Y. Underwood, #4 Declaration of William P. Cole, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief /Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration of William P. Cole, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER from the Judicial Panel on MDL denying Motion for Centralization of this action. Signed by Judge No Judge Assigned on 06/02/2017. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION/ORDER administratively terminating #19 Motion to Stay; administratively terminating #22 Motion to Dismiss; the parties shall re-file their motion w/in (15) days after receiving that ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/27/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 24 STIPULATION --Joint Stipulation to Stay Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Compalint and Def. Motion to Stay Proceeding Pending Ruling from JPML by JAMES VANDERWERFF. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMES VANDERWERFF re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Brief /Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of William P. Cole, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MATTHEW R. ORR and WILLIAM P. COLE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew R. Orr, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William P. Cole, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MATTHEW R. ORR, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW032729 (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee as to WILLIAM P. COLE, ESQ. : $ 150, receipt number NEW032728 (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration of William Cole, #3 Certification 11.2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD identifying Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. MARK UNDERWOOD served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Underwood-Quincy Bio. Holding, #2 Certificate of Service Underwood - Quincy LLC)(RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/3/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. PREVAGEN, INC served on 2/10/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #11 Letter Appl. for pro hac vice admission as to MATTHEW R. ORR, ESQ. & WILLIAM P. COLE, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/28/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 11 Letter from Jeffrey S. Jacobson for the pro hac vice application of William P. Cole and Matthew R. Orr on consent.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Jacobson i/s/o Matthew R. Orr Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Orr, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Matthew Orr Pro Hac Vice Application, #4 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson i/s/o William P. Cole Pro Hac Vice Application, #5 Declaration of William P. Cole, #6 Text of Proposed Order for William P. Cole Pro Hac Vice Application)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC., served on 2/15/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC served on 2/15/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. PREVAGEN, INC served on 2/15/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (RODDY, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall file any motion to stay the Action no later than March 30, 2017; Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 1, 2017, to file his Opposition to the motion to stay and Defendants shall have up to and including May 15, 2017, to file any Reply; Defts. shall Answer, Move or otherwise Respond by 4/10/17; Plaintiff shall have up to and including thirty (30) days to file his opposition to any such Rule 12(b)(2) or Rule 12(b)(6) motions filed by Defendants and Defendants shall have fifteen (15) days to file any Replies in support of the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/9/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 6 STIPULATION On Behalf Of All Parties To Set Briefing Schedule On Anticipated Motion To Stay And Extend Defendants' Responsive Deadline by MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. JACOBSON on behalf of All Defendants (JACOBSON, JEFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. SANTOLI on behalf of JAMES VANDERWERFF (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SANTOLI, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. LAPINSKI on behalf of JAMES VANDERWERFF (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Brian Y. Lawrence* (byl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL BEAMAN, PREVAGEN, INC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.,, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE MANUFACTURING, LLC, QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC, MARK UNDERWOOD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7635525) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JAMES VANDERWERFF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(byl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanderwerff v. Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beaman
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc.,
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevagen, Inc.
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Underwood
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY S. JACOBSON
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Represented By: GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vanderwerff
Represented By: Kevin Peter Roddy
Represented By: JOSEPH R. SANTOLI
Represented By: DANIEL R. LAPINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?