Martinez Epifanio et al v. Delancey's Ludlow LLC et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Martinez Epifanio
Defendant: Mangesh Shah, Manan Shah, Rajesh Shah, Kiran K Lal, Pablo Doe, Delancey's Ludlow LLC and Pratik Shah
Case Number: 1:2019cv07593
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the parties hereto, that the time for Defendants DELANCY'S LUDLOW LLC (D/B/A GREEN STAR FOODS) KIRAN K LALL, RAJESH SHAH, PRATIK SHAH, MANAN SHAH, and MANGESH SHAH, to answer, respond or otherwise move in regard to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including October 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Delancey's Ludlow LLC answer due 10/14/2019; Manan Shah answer due 10/14/2019; Mangesh Shah answer due 10/14/2019; Pratik Shah answer due 10/14/2019; Rajesh Shah answer due 10/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/16/2019) (ne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Delancey's Ludlow LLC, Pablo Doe, Kiran K Lal, Manan Shah, Mangesh Shah, Pratik Shah, Rajesh Shah. (Bellovin, Marshall)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Benjamin Bellovin on behalf of Delancey's Ludlow LLC, Kiran K Lal, Manan Shah, Mangesh Shah, Pratik Shah, Rajesh Shah. (Bellovin, Marshall)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Rajesh Shah served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Pratik Shah served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Pablo Doe served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mangesh Shah served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Manan Shah served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kiran K Lal served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Avani, a coworker. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yolanda Rivero on behalf of Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Rivero, Yolanda)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Delancey's Ludlow LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Cott no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference, which is currently scheduled (by separate Order to be entered today) for November 26, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/15/2019) (jca)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/15/2019) (jca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rajesh Shah. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pratik Shah. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pablo Doe. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mangesh Shah. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manan Shah. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kiran K Lal. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delancey's Ludlow LLC. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rajesh Shah, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pratik Shah, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pablo Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mangesh Shah, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manan Shah, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kiran K Lal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Delancey's Ludlow LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delancey's Ludlow LLC, Pablo Doe, Kiran K Lal, Manan Shah, Mangesh Shah, Pratik Shah, Rajesh Shah. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17425091)Document filed by Salvador Martinez Epifanio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Salvador Martinez Epifanio(individually).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Epifanio et al v. Delancey's Ludlow LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mangesh Shah
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manan Shah
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Shah
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran K Lal
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delancey's Ludlow LLC
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratik Shah
Represented By: Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Martinez Epifanio
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Yolanda Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?