DeJesus v. Jara et al
Plaintiff: Steven DeJesus
Defendant: Helium Plus East, Inc. and Omar Jara
Case Number: 1:2019cv07640
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed withing 30 days from the date of this Order. All counsel must meet face-to~face for at least one hour to discuss settlement within fourteen (14) days following the close of fact discovery. Deposition due by 12/6/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Expert Discovery due by 2/25/2020. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is Four-seven Days. This ORDER may not be modified or the dates herein extended, except by further Order of this Court for good cause shown. Any application to modify or extend the dates herein (except as noted in paragraph 6) shall be made in a written application in accordance with paragraph 1.E of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices and shall be made no less than two (2) business days prior to the expiration of the date sought to be extended. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/16/2019) (rj)
September 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2019. Domhnall O'Cathain present for Plaintiff. Laurine Rubin present for Defendants. (ajs)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Helium Plus East, Inc., Omar Jara. (Scahill, Francis)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Domhnall O'Cathain, Esq dated 09/05/2019 re: Joint Letter Pursuant to Individual Rules and Practices Prior to Initial Case Management Conference. Document filed by Steven DeJesus.(O'Cathain, Domhnall)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Notice (Other). ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update and asks defense counsel to file a letter on the docket by September 9, 2019, advising the Court both of the state of incorporation and the state of the principal place of business for defendant Helium Plus East, Inc. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/5/2019) (jwh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Helium Plus East, Inc., Omar Jara. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Scahill, Francis)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Letter of Removal. Document filed by Helium Plus East, Inc., Omar Jara. (Scahill, Francis)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Domhnall Muiris O'Cathain on behalf of Steven DeJesus. (O'Cathain, Domhnall)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/20/2019) (rj)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (wb)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Francis Scahill. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scahill, Francis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28623-19. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17432320).Document filed by Omar Jara, Helium Plus East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Demands)(Scahill, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJesus v. Jara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helium Plus East, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Scahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Jara
Represented By: Francis Scahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven DeJesus
Represented By: Domhnall Muiris O'Cathain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?