Chen v. Lilis 200 West 57th Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Chang Yan Chen
Defendant: Jonah Phillips, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Thean Choo Chong, Migi "Doe", Ephan "Doe", Alan Phillips, Siew Moy Low, Alfred Chong, "Migi" Doe, Baumgart's Next Door, Inc. and Maggie Low
Case Number: 1:2019cv07654
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to LILIS 200 WEST 57TH CORP. d/b/a Lili's 57 Asian Cuisine & Sushi Bar; ALAN PHILLIPS; JONAH PHILLIPS; THEAN CHOO CHONG a/k/a Alfred Chong; EPHAN "DOE"; "MIGI" DOE, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baumgart's Next Door, Inc., Siew Moy Low. (pc)
October 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LILIS 200 WEST 57TH CORP. d/b/a Lili's 57 Asian Cuisine & Sushi Bar; ALAN PHILLIPS; JONAH PHILLIPS; THEAN CHOO CHONG a/k/a Alfred Chong; EPHAN "DOE"; "MIGI" DOE, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BAUMGART'S NEXT DOOR, INC. d/b/a Baumgart's Cafe; SIEW MOY LOW a/k/a Maggie Low, re: #10 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the pleading accepted by the Court;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to LILIS 200 WEST 57TH CORP. d/b/a Lili's 57 Asian Cuisine & Sushi Bar; ALAN PHILLIPS, JONAH PHILLIPS, THEAN CHOO CHONG a/k/a Alfred Chong, EPHAN "DOE", and "MIGI" DOE, re: #16 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John) Modified on 10/9/2019 (jgo).
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BAUMGARTS NEXT DOOR, INC. d/b/a Baumgarts Cafe; SIEW MOY LOW a/k/a Maggie Low, re: #16 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John) Modified on 10/9/2019 (jgo).
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint,, against Ephan "Doe", Baumgart's Next Door, Inc., Thean Choo Chong, "Migi" Doe, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Siew Moy Low, Alan Phillips, Jonah Phillips.Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne).
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. "Migi" Doe served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ephan "Doe" served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Thean Choo Chong served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonah Phillips served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Alan Phillips served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe", Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
September 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Siew Moy Low; Baumgart's Next Door, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Ephan "Doe", Thean Choo Chong, "Migi" Doe, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Alan Phillips, Jonah Phillips, Baumgart's Next Door, Inc., Siew Low Low.Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/21/2019.(mf)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/16/2019) (rpr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Thean Choo Chong, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp..(Morrison, Lawrence)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lilis 200 West 57th Corp..(Morrison, Lawrence)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ephan "Doe", Thean Choo Chong, "Migi" Doe, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Alan Phillips, Jonah Phillips. (pne)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Thean Choo Chong. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Chang Yan Chen. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen.(Troy, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LILIS 200 WEST 57TH CORP. d/b/a Lili's 57 Asian Cuisine & Sushi Bar; ALAN PHILLIPS, JONAH PHILLIPS, THEAN CHOO CHONG a/k/a Alfred Chong, EPHAN "DOE", and "MIGI" DOE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Troy, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ephan "Doe", Migi "Doe", Thean Choo Chong, Lilis 200 West 57th Corp., Alan Phillips, Jonah Phillips. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17437354)Document filed by Chang Yan Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Lilis 200 West 57th Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilis 200 West 57th Corp.
Represented By: Lawrence Figowe Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thean Choo Chong
Represented By: Lawrence Figowe Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Migi "Doe"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ephan "Doe"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siew Moy Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Chong
Represented By: Lawrence Figowe Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Migi" Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baumgart's Next Door, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chang Yan Chen
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?