Milton-Pope v. PV Holding Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Milton-Pope, Tanya Goode and Beonca Goode
Defendant: Jason R Kropsky and PV Holding Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07684
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 11, 2019 shall be adjourned until October 25, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/7/2019) (rro) Modified on 10/8/2019 (rro).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Heather Golin Hammerman dated October 4, 2019. Document filed by Jason R Kropsky, PV Holding Corp..(Golin, Heather)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Tanya Goode.(Duncan, Susan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference on October 11, 2019 at 12:45 p.m. in Courtroom 518 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/18/2019) (js)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Golin, Heather)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jason R Kropsky, PV Holding Corp..(Golin, Heather)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27625/2019E..Document filed by Jason R Kropsky, PV Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Police Report)(Golin, Heather)
August 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Heather Gayle Golin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Heather Gayle Golin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Heather Gayle Golin to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17440623, paid on 8/16/2019. (gp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Golin, Heather) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jgo).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of BRONX. Case Number: 27625/2019E..Document filed by Jason R Kropsky, PV Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Police Report)(Golin, Heather) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jgo).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PV Holding Corp..(Golin, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton-Pope v. PV Holding Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Milton-Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Goode
Represented By: Susan G Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beonca Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason R Kropsky
Represented By: Heather Gayle Golin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PV Holding Corp.
Represented By: Heather Gayle Golin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?