Huang et al v. Shanghai City Corp et al
Plaintiff: Hui Zhen Huang, Lianqin Lu, Huer Huang, Clara Flores, Juan Li, Haihua Zhai, Gloria Perez Mendez, Reyes Perez Guerrero, Hai Hua Zhai, Jianguo Zhao, Maximino Raymundo, Zhenghua Wang, Guoliang Xu, Guang Qing He, Aragon Cardoso Cruz and Baofu Yan
Defendant: Terry Ho, Solomon C Liou, East Brother, Corp, Cheng Kueng Liu, Lillian Liou, Yiu Fi Fong, Yun Cai, William Ko, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Kiu Sang Si, John Zhang, Shanghai City Corp, Mimi Si, Gui Bing Shi, Tun Yee Lam, Yiu Fai Fong, Joe Si, Peter Lam, Terry and Joseph Si
Case Number: 1:2019cv07702
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yun Cai, East Brother, Corp, Yiu Fai Fong, Terry Ho, William Ko, Tun Yee Lam, Lillian Liou, Solomon C Liou, Cheng Kueng Liu, Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Gui Bing Shi, Kiu Sang Si, Mimi Si, John Zhang. (jgo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHANGHAI CITY CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, SHANGHAI DUPLICATE CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, EAST BROTHER CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, SHANGHAI ORIGINAL INC. d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, KIU SANG SI a/k/a Joseph Si a/k/a Joe Si, YIU FAI FONG, TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam, GUI BING SHI, SOLOMON C. LIOU, MIMI SI, WILLIAM KO, LILLIAN LIOU, CHENG KUENG LIU, YUN CAI, JOHN ZHANG, TERRY HO, re: #17 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Clara Flores(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Huer Huang(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Hui Zhen Huang(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class), Juan Li(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class), Lianqin Lu(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Reyes Perez Guerrero(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Gloria Perez Mendez(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Maximino Raymundo, Hai Hua Zhai. (Troy, John)
October 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #18 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text and the attached 'rider' does not exactly match pleading (Cheung Kueng Liu should be Cheng Kueng Liu);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHANGHAI CITY CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, SHANGHAI DUPLICATE CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, EAST BROTHER CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, SHANGHAI ORIGINAL INC. d/b/a Joe's Shanghai, KIU SANG SI a/k/a Joseph Si a/k/a Joe Si, YIU FAI FONG, TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam, GUI BING SHI, SOLOMON C. LIOU, MIMI SI, WILLIAM KO, LILLIAN LIOU, CHEUNG KUENG LIU, YUN CAI, JOHN ZHANG, TERRY HO, re: #17 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Clara Flores(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Huer Huang(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Hui Zhen Huang(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class), Juan Li(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class), Lianqin Lu(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Reyes Perez Guerrero(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Gloria Perez Mendez(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Maximino Raymundo, Hai Hua Zhai. (Troy, John) Modified on 10/10/2019 (jgo).
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tun Yee Lam. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Yun Cai, East Brother, Corp, Yiu Fai Fong, Terry Ho, William Ko, Tun Yee Lam, Lillian Liou, Solomon C Liou, Cheng Kueng Liu, Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Gui Bing Shi, Kiu Sang Si, Mimi Si, John Zhang.Document filed by Huer Huang(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Lianqin Lu(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class), Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Juan Li(on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class), Maximino Raymundo, Hai Hua Zhai, Hui Zhen Huang(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Gloria Perez Mendez(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Clara Flores(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Reyes Perez Guerrero(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated). Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Reyes Perez Guerrero added. Party added pursuant to #16 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Reyes Perez Guerrero. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Clara Flores added. Party added pursuant to #16 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Clara Flores. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Gloria Perez Mendez added. Party added pursuant to #16 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Gloria Perez Mendez. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Lianqin Lu added. Party added pursuant to #16 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Lianqin Lu. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Huer Huang added. Party added pursuant to #16 Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Huer Huang. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint,,.(Troy, John)
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE re: Document No. #16 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties Huer Huang, Lianqin Lu, Gloria Perez Mendez, Clara Flores and Reyes Perez Guerrero with party text 'on behalf of themselves, and on behalf others similarly situated in the Proposed FLSA Collective and Potential Rule 23 Class'; the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against All Defendants.Document filed by Juan Li(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Lianqin Lu, Huer Huang, Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Maximino Raymundo, Hai Hua Zhai, Hui Zhen Huang(on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated), Gloria Perez Mendez, Clara Flores, Reyes Perez Guerrero. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Troy, John) Modified on 10/8/2019 (jgo).
September 19, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Hai Hua Zhai, Hui Zhen Huang, Juan Li added. Party added pursuant to #6 Amended Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Hai Hua Zhai, Hui Zhen Huang, Juan Li. Related document: #6 Amended Complaint,,,,.(Troy, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/6/2019) (ks)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Troy re: Document No. #6 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; you must add Hui Zhen Huang, Juan Li and Hai Hua Zhai on behalf of themselves, and on behalf of others similarly situated in the Potential Rule 23 Class. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
August 25, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Maximino Raymundo.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Aragon Cardoso Cruz.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Guang Qing He.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jianguo Zhao.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Zhenghua Wang.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Guoliang Xu.(Troy, John)
August 25, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Baofu Yan.(Troy, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHANGHAI CITY CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; SHANGHAI DUPLICATE CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; EAST BROTHER CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; and SHANGHAI ORIGINAL INC. d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; KIU SANG SI a/k/a Joseph Si a/k/a Joe Si, YIU FAI FONG, TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam, GUI BING SHI, SOLOMON C. LIOU, MIMI SI, WILLIAM KO, LILLIAN LIOU, CHENG KUENG LIU, YUN CAI, JOHN ZHANG, and TERRY HO, re: #6 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Clara Flores, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Juan Li, Lianqin Lu, Reyes Perez Guerrero, Gloria Perez Mendez, Maximino Raymundo, Haihua Zhai. (Troy, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against Yun Cai, East Brother, Corp, Yiu Fai Fong, Terry Ho, William Ko, Tun Yee Lam, Lillian Liou, Solomon C Liou, Cheng Kueng Liu, Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Gui Bing Shi, Kiu Sang Si, Mimi Si, John Zhang.Document filed by Juan Li, Lianqin Lu, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Gloria Perez Mendez, Haihua Zhai, Clara Flores, Reyes Perez Guerrero, Aragon Cardoso Cruz, Maximino Raymundo. Related document: #4 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited, #7 Exhibit 07 Joe's Shanghai Formal Declaration of Company Ownership, #8 Exhibit 08 Joe's Shanghai Brochure Joe Si as Owner)(Troy, John) Modified on 8/26/2019 (sj).
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name on summons (Terry Ho) does not match the party name on the complaint caption title (document 1);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Troy to Document No. #4 Complaint,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The caption title has been changed from the initial complaint. Permission from Chambers will be needed to file a Corrected Complaint with the correct caption title or you can file an Amended Complaint. (pc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHANGHAI CITY CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; SHANGHAI DUPLICATE CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; EAST BROTHER CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; and SHANGHAI ORIGINAL INC. d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; KIU SANG SI a/k/a Joseph Si a/k/a Joe Si, YIU FAI FONG, TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam, GUI BING SHI, SOLOMON C. LIOU, MIMI SI, WILLIAM KO, LILLIAN LIOU, CHENG KUENG LIU, YUN CAI, JOHN ZHANG, and TERRY HO, re: #4 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Clara Flores, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Juan Li, Lianqin Lu, Reyes Perez Guerrero, Gloria Perez Mendez, Haihua Zhai. (Troy, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pc).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING -DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -COMPLAINT against Yun Cai, East Brother, Corp, Yiu Fi Fong, Terry Ho, William Ko, Tun Yee Lam, Lillian Liou, Solomon C Liou, Cheng Kueng Liu, Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Gui Bing Shi, Kiu Sang Si, Mimi Si, John Zhang. Document filed by Juan Li, Lianqin Lu, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Gloria Perez Mendez, Haihua Zhai, Clara Flores, Reyes Perez Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited, #7 Exhibit 07 Joe's Shanghai Formal Declaration of Company Ownership, #8 Exhibit 08 Joe's Shanghai Brochure Joe Si as Owner)(Troy, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pc).
August 20, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Terry Ho added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Terry Ho. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Troy, John)
August 20, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Tun Yee Lam added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Tun Yee Lam. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Troy, John)
August 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Queens;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam and Terry Ho are not parties listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Troy re: Document No. #1 Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Tun Yee Lam to CM ECF with the alias aka "Peter Lam". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
August 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Yiu Fi Fong, East Brother, Corp, Kiu Sang Si and Terry Ho. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHANGHAI CITY CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; SHANGHAI DUPLICATE CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; EAST BROTHER CORP d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; ; and SHANGHAI ORIGINAL INC. d/b/a Joe's Shanghai; KIU SANG SI a/k/a Joseph Si a/k/a Joe Si, YIU FAI FONG, TUN YEE LAM a/k/a Peter Lam, GUI BING SHI, SOLOMON C. LIOU, MIMI SI, WILLIAM KO, LILLIAN LIOU, CHENG KUENG LIU, YUN CAI, JOHN ZHANG, and TERRY HO, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Clara Flores, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Lianqin Lu, Reyes Perez Guerrero, Gloria Perez Mendez, Haihua Zhai. (Troy, John) Modified on 8/19/2019 (pc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yun Cai, East Brother, Corp, Yiu Fi Fong, Terry Ho, William Ko, Lillian Liou, Solomon C Liou, Cheng Kueng Liu, Shanghai City Corp, Shanghai Duplicate Corp, Shanghai Original Inc, Gui Bing Shi, Kiu Sang Si, Mimi Si, John Zhang. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17447368)Document filed by Juan Li, Lianqin Lu, Huer Huang, Hui Zhen Huang, Gloria Perez Mendez, Haihua Zhai, Clara Flores, Reyes Perez Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited, #7 Exhibit 07 Joe's Shanghai Formal Declaration of Company Ownership, #8 Exhibit 08 Joe's Shanghai Brochure Joe Si as Owner)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang et al v. Shanghai City Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Zhen Huang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lianqin Lu
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huer Huang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Flores
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Li
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haihua Zhai
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Perez Mendez
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Perez Guerrero
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hai Hua Zhai
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianguo Zhao
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximino Raymundo
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhenghua Wang
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guoliang Xu
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guang Qing He
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aragon Cardoso Cruz
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baofu Yan
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon C Liou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Brother, Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheng Kueng Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Liou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiu Fi Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Cai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Duplicate Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Original Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiu Sang Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai City Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gui Bing Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tun Yee Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiu Fai Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?