Rekor Systems, Inc. v. Loughlin et al
Plaintiff: Rekor Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield and Suzanne Loughlin
Case Number: 1:2019cv07767
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ; granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to the amended complaint is extended to November 15, 2019. The Initial Pretrial Conference will be held on December 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submissions are due by November 28, 2019. Suzanne Loughlin answer due 11/15/2019; Harry Rhulen answer due 11/15/2019; James Satterfield answer due 11/15/2019. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/15/2019) (rj)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert C. Boneberg dated October 14, 2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert C. Boneberg dated October 14, 2019. Document filed by Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield.(Boneberg, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield.Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Side Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Side Letter 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Franchise Agreement)(Gilbert, Sarah)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Sarah M. Gilbert dated October 9, 2019 re: Filing of Amended Complaint. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc..(Gilbert, Sarah)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Clifford Boneberg on behalf of Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield. New Address: Robert C. Boneberg, Esq., 43 Madison Avenue, Maplewood, New Jersey, United States 07040, 9738866576. (Boneberg, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Clifford Boneberg on behalf of Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield. (Boneberg, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED as to all Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/13/2019) (ama)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Suzanne Loughlin answer due 10/17/2019; Harry Rhulen answer due 10/17/2019; James Satterfield answer due 10/17/2019. (ama)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy dated 9.12.2019. Document filed by Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield.(McFerrin-Clancy, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. (Gilbert, Sarah)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Clifford Boneberg on behalf of Suzanne Loughlin. (Boneberg, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy on behalf of Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield. (McFerrin-Clancy, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/09/2019) (ama)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc..(Gilbert, Sarah)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Satterfield. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harry Rhulen. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suzanne Loughlin. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sarah Gilbert. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Satterfield, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. (Gilbert, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harry Rhulen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. (Gilbert, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzanne Loughlin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. (Gilbert, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gilbert, Sarah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17455785)Document filed by Rekor Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Ex. B - Franchise Agreement, #3 Ex. C - side letter, #4 Ex. D - side letter)(Gilbert, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rekor Systems, Inc. v. Loughlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rekor Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Rhulen
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Satterfield
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Loughlin
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?