Doe v. Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn et al
Plaintiff: Priscilla Doe
Defendant: JEGE, Inc., Maple, Inc., HBRK Associates, Inc., Financial Trust Company, Inc., LSJ, LLC, Nine East 71st Street, Corporation, Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn as Joint Personal Representatives of The Estate of Jeffrey E. Epstein, NES, LLC and Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn
Case Number: 1:2019cv07772
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File decision issued by Judge Castel addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Bradley Edwards, Esq. dated October 16, 2019. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Decision Issued by Judge Castel)(Edwards, Bradley)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. SO ORDERED. Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn answer due 11/15/2019; Financial Trust Company, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; HBRK Associates, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; JEGE, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; LSJ, LLC answer due 11/15/2019; Maple, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; NES, LLC answer due 11/15/2019; Nine East 71st Street, Corporation answer due 11/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/3/2019) (rj)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Pottinger to RE-FILE Document No. #25 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party text is not required in the defendant 'To:' section of the summons PDF; if party text is included, text must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn as Co-Executors of Estate of Jeffrey E. Epstein, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John) Modified on 9/30/2019 (dnh).
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to November 15, 2019 addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated September 18, 2019. Document filed by Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, Financial Trust Company, Inc., HBRK Associates, Inc., JEGE, Inc., LSJ, LLC, Maple, Inc., NES, LLC, Nine East 71st Street, Corporation.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bennet Jerome Moskowitz on behalf of Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, Financial Trust Company, Inc., HBRK Associates, Inc., JEGE, Inc., LSJ, LLC, Maple, Inc., NES, LLC, Nine East 71st Street, Corporation. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEGE, Inc.. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEGE, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HBRK Associates, Inc.. (dnh) (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/11/2019) (dnh).
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LSJ, LLC. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maple, Inc.. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NES, LLC. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Financial Trust Company, Inc.. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nine East 71st Street, Corporation. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Pottinger to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name (Jege, Inc. c/o Josh Estes). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEGE, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John) Modified on 9/11/2019 (dnh).
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HBRK Associates, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LSJ, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maple, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Financial Trust Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nine East 71st Street, Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Pottinger, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #5 Motion for Bradley J. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules Governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/3/2019) (js)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Brittany N. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/28/2019) (rj)
August 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Brittany N. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17503637. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for Bradley J. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17503629. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Brittany N. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17503637. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Brittany N. Henderson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Brittany)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Bradley J. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17503629. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Bradley J. Edwards, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Bradley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pottinger, John)
August 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Pottinger to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption entered on civil cover sheet is incorrect; if all party names to not fit in the space provided, name the first party listed followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Pottinger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn, Nine East 71st Street, Corporation, Financial Trust Company, Inc., NES, LLC, Maple, Inc., LSJ, LLC, HBRK Associates, Inc., JEGE, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text was entered incorrectly. (pne)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pottinger, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pottinger, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pne).
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn as Joint Personal Representatives of The Estate of Jeffrey E. Epstein, Financial Trust Company, Inc., HBRK Associates, Inc., JEGE, Inc., LSJ, LLC, Maple, Inc., NES, LLC, Nine East 71st Street, Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17456814)Document filed by Priscilla Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pottinger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEGE, Inc.
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple, Inc.
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBRK Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Trust Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSJ, LLC
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine East 71st Street, Corporation
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn as Joint Personal Representatives of The Estate of Jeffrey E. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NES, LLC
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren K. Indyke and Richard D. Kahn
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Doe
Represented By: John Pottinger
Represented By: Brittany Henderson
Represented By: Bradley James Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?