Pegaso Development Inc. v. Moriah Education Management LP et al
Plaintiff: Pegaso Development Inc.
Defendant: Moriah Software Management LP and Moriah Education Management LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv07787
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Moriah Education Management LP answer due 11/1/2019; Moriah Software Management LP answer due 11/1/2019. (ks)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By November 1, 2019, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The initial pretrial conference is not adjourned. By October 23, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/18/2019) (ks)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the parties to submit a joint letter addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alan F. Kaufman, Esq. by Consent on behalf of Defendants Moriah Education Mgmt and Moriah Software Management dated October 18, 2019. Document filed by Moriah Education Management LP, Moriah Software Management LP.(Kaufman, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Scott Mendeloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jqw)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Gabriel Aizenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jqw)
August 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Scott Mendeloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Gabriel Aizenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17483965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Scott Mendeloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice $200.00 receipt #ANYSDC-17484032 paid. . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc..(Mendeloff, Scott) Modified on 8/23/2019 (bcu).
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Gabriel Aizenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17483965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc..(Aizenberg, Gabriel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Moriah Software Management LP. (dnh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Moriah Education Management LP. (dnh)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2019) (cf)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/23/2019) (cf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MoriahSoftware Management LP, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Wargo, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Moriah Education Management LP, re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Wargo, William)
August 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William Andrew Wargo to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons requests are linked to a pleading that was not accepted by the Court. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
August 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Andrew Wargo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (pne)
August 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Moriah Education Management LP, Moriah Software Management LP. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MEM 2016 Note, #2 Exhibit B - MSM 2017 Note)(Wargo, William)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Andrew Wargo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF attached for the Initial Pleading does not indicate what type of document is being filed (Complaint, Short Form Complaint, Petition, etc.). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/26/2019. (pne)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Moriah Software Management LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Wargo, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Moriah Education Management LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Wargo, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc..(Wargo, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wargo, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Moriah Education Management LP, Moriah Software Management LP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17461005)Document filed by Pegaso Development Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- MEM 2016 Note, #2 Exhibit B - MSM 2017 Note)(Wargo, William) Modified on 8/21/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pegaso Development Inc. v. Moriah Education Management LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pegaso Development Inc.
Represented By: William Andrew Wargo
Represented By: Gabriel Aizenberg
Represented By: Scott Mendeloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moriah Software Management LP
Represented By: Alan Frederick Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moriah Education Management LP
Represented By: Alan Frederick Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?