Willson v. New York City Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Carol Willson
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv07920
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by New York City Housing Authority. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. New York City Housing Authority answer due 11/20/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/26/2019) (jca)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Seth E. Kramer dated September 24, 2019 re: Request of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by New York City Housing Authority.(Kramer, Seth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Eric Kramer on behalf of New York City Housing Authority. (Kramer, Seth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Housing Authority served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Secretary/Receptionist. Document filed by Carol Willson. (Heller, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Housing Authority. (pne)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Willson. (Heller, Steven)
August 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Eugene Heller to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/27/2019) (jca)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/26/2019) (jca)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Joseph Josephson on behalf of Carol Willson. (Josephson, Edward)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heller, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Carol Willson.(Heller, Steven)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Willson. (Heller, Steven) Modified on 8/28/2019 (pc).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Housing Authority. Document filed by Carol Willson.(Heller, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willson v. New York City Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Housing Authority
Represented By: Seth Eric Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Willson
Represented By: Edward Joseph Josephson
Represented By: Steven Eugene Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?