Arana v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Pedro Arana
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Director James McHenry, Thomas Decker, Atty General William P. Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Attorney General William Barr, Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Acting Director Matthew Albence and Director Thomas Decker
Case Number: 1:2019cv07924
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Expedite adjudication of this habeas petition and, in the alternative, to request scheduling of oral argument pursuant to Individual Rule IV.D addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Aadhithi Padmanabhan dated October 14, 2019. Document filed by Pedro Arana.(Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Pedro Arana. (Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Matthew Albence, William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry. (Byars, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Deportation Officer Jason Mascia in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Matthew Albence, William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry. (Byars, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Matthew Albence, William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arana's Rap Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Indictment, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Disposition, #4 Exhibit D - Custody Determination, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to Appear, #6 Exhibit F - Notice to EOIR: Alien Address, #7 Exhibit G - Immigration Judge Order dated November 7, 2018, #8 Exhibit H - Immigration Judge Order dated May 14, 2019, #9 Exhibit I - Immigration Judge Order dated July 3, 2019, #10 Exhibit J - Immigration Judge Order dated July 16, 2019, #11 Exhibit K - Immigration Judge Order dated August 16, 2019)(Byars, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Matthew Albence, William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry. (Byars, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter, filed by Pedro Arana. On behalf of Pedro Arana, the petitioner in the above-captioned case challenging his prolonged immigration detention without adequate procedural safeguards, I write to seek the Court's approval of the briefing schedule the parties jointly propose on the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1) that was filed on August 23, 2019. Specifically, the parties propose that the government's response be due by September 19, 2019, and the petitioner's reply be due by October 3, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Responses due by 9/19/2019, Replies due by 10/3/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/10/2019) (js)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Aadhithi Padmanabhan dated September 6, 2019 re: Joint Proposal for Briefing Schedule on Habeas Petition. Document filed by Pedro Arana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aadhithi Padmanabhan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew Albence, William Barr, Thomas Decker, Kevin McAleenan, James McHenry. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aadhithi Padmanabhan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Marion Koshy in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Pedro Arana. (Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Colleen Vecchione in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Pedro Arana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plea minutes, #2 Exhibit Sentencing minutes, #3 Exhibit Immigration Judge decision, #4 Exhibit BIA decision, #5 Exhibit BIA decision, #6 Exhibit Letter from appeals attorney)(Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17483864)Document filed by Pedro Arana.(Padmanabhan, Aadhithi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arana v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director James McHenry
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atty General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Matthew Albence
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Thomas Decker
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Arana
Represented By: Aadhithi Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?