Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C. v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C., and Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1-10, Optum Group, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07972
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #31 Letter filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C. ENDORSEMENT: Because the parties agree that discovery should be stayed pending resolution of the pending motion to dismiss, the initial conference is CANCELLED, and discovery is STAYED, pending further order. Plaintiff is advised that, in response to any motion to dismiss, he may either respond to the motion or amend his complaint, but he may not do both; any amendment would result in the denial of the motion to dismiss as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/18/2019) (ama)
October 17, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Eric Szoke dated 10/17/2019 re: Status. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C..(Peters, Aparna)
October 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #29 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
October 10, 2019 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michelle S. Grant dated 10/10/2019 re: enclosing proposed order granting motion to dismiss. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Grant, Michelle)
October 10, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Related Document Number: #27 . (Grant, Michelle) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Grant, Michelle)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Responses due by 10/24/2019(Grant, Michelle)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF MICHELLE S. GRANT PRO HAC VICE granting #25 MOTION for Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/10/2019) (jca)
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michelle S. Grant, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Michelle)
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17739492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from State of Minnesota;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17739492. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michelle S. Grant, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Michelle) Modified on 10/9/2019 (wb).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. John Doe Entities 1-10 answer due 10/10/2019; Optum Group, LLC answer due 10/10/2019; United Healthcare Services, Inc. answer due 10/10/2019; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer due 10/10/2019 (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/2019) (cf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Christopher G. Karagheuzoff dated September 20, 2019. Document filed by Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Karagheuzoff, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher George Karagheuzoff on behalf of Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Karagheuzoff, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. Service was accepted by Kaylee Feicole. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. Service was accepted by Kaylee Feicole. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Optum Group, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/13/2019) (mro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Peters, Aparna)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (pne)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (pne)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum Group, LLC. (pne)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Szoke, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Healthcare Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Szoke, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.. (Szoke, Eric)
August 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eric Szoke to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Include c/o after the party's name (UnitedHealth Group Incorporated) (United Healthcare Services, Inc.) (Optum Group, LLC);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Szoke, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Eric Szoke to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. Multiple natures of suit were selected, choose one.;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
August 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric Szoke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,. (Szoke, Eric) Modified on 8/27/2019 (pc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Healthcare Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,. (Szoke, Eric) Modified on 8/27/2019 (pc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,. (Szoke, Eric) Modified on 8/27/2019 (pc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,.(Szoke, Eric)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aparna Anantharaman on behalf of MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,. (Anantharaman, Aparna)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Szoke, Eric) Modified on 8/27/2019 (pc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe Entities 1-10, Optum Group, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17493454)Document filed by MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,.(Szoke, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C. v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher George Karagheuzoff
Represented By: Michelle S. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher George Karagheuzoff
Represented By: Michelle S. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher George Karagheuzoff
Represented By: Michelle S. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. JONES. M.D., P.C.,
Represented By: Eric Szoke
Represented By: Aparna Anantharaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jones, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Eric Szoke
Represented By: Aparna Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?