Make the Road New York et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York, Asian American Federation and African Services Committee
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli and United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Amicus Curiae: American Public Health Association, Congressional Tri-Caucus, American Academy of Nursing, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, Justice in Aging, American Academy of Pediatrics, National Council on Aging, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;, PHI, National Hispanic Council on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Health Law Advocates et al., MAZON, Immigration Reform Law Institute, American Society on Aging and Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Interested Party: National Council on Independent Living, Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center, Economic Progress Institute, Child Care Law Center, Center for Public Representation, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, New York Civil Liberties Union, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, Mental Health America, Disability Rights Advocates, Boundless Immigration, Community Action Marin, Oasis Legal Services, National Disability Rights Network, Kids Forward, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Fiscal Policy Institute, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, The Arc of United States, American Civil Liberties Union, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, National Federation of the Blind, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, United Spinal Association, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, American Association of People with Disabilities, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Little Lobbyists, Disability Rights New York and California Immigrant Policy Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv07993
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Daniel Renaud in Support re: #149 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #149 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 149 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Attorney Christopher John Frisina terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/15/19) (yv)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York). Plaintiffs' motion for issuance of a preliminary injunction, (ECF No. 38), is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2019) (ama)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting #38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a), Defendants are RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from: 1. Enforcing, applying or treating as effective, or allowing persons under their control to enforce, apply, or treat as effective, the Rule; and 2. Implementing, considering in connection with any application, or requiring the use of any new or updated forms whose submission would be required under the Rule, including the new Form I-944, titled "Declaration of Self Sufficiency," and the updated Form I-485, titled "Application to Register Permanent Residence of Adjust Status"; and, It is hereby FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 705, the effective date of the Rule is STAYED and POSTPONED sine die pending further Order of the Court such that, if this Order is later terminated and the Rule goes into effect, the Rule's stated effective date of October 15, 2019, as well as any references in the Rule to October 15, 2019, including but not limited those contained in proposed 8 CFR 212.20, 212.22(b)(4)(i)(E), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(E)(1), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(E)(2), 212.22(b)(4)(ii)(F), 212.22(c)(1)(ii), 212.22(d), 214.1, 248.1(a), and 248.1(c)(4), shall be replaced with a date after this Order is terminated. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/11/2019) (jwh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION for Christopher J. Frisina to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars.(Frisina, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #143 Motion for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/9/2019) (rj)
October 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #143 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17576471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-17576471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny)
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #141 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 142 RESPONSE to Motion re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Language of Proposed Injunction Pursuant to Court's Request at Oral Argument). Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Soskin, Eric)
October 8, 2019 Filing 141 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. Related Document Number: #38 . (Hurwitz, Jonathan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 10/7/2019 re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York).Plaintiff Counsel: Andrew James Ehrlich, Elana Rose Beale, Robert Joseph O'Loughlin III, Daniel Shiah Sinnreich, Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz, Ghita Schwarz, Susan Elizabeth Welber, Susan Joan Cameron, Kathleen Mary Kelleher, Hasan Shafiqullah, Brittany Thomas Defense Counsel: Eric Soskin, Ethan Price Davis and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #137 Motion for Phillip A. Escoriaza to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/7/2019) (jwh)
October 6, 2019 Filing 139 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated October 6, 2019 re: Correction to Rule. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Soskin on behalf of Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Soskin, Eric)
October 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #137 MOTION for Phillip A. Escoriaza to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 4, 2019 Filing 137 MOTION for Phillip A. Escoriaza to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escoriaza, Phillip)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #132 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici the Immigration Reform Law Institute' s motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Defendants, (ECF No. 132), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/4/2019) (jwh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Robert J. O'Loughlin in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46 - Conference Report, #2 Exhibit 47 - Bill Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 48 - Corrections to Rule)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 134 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Price Davis on behalf of Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Davis, Ethan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Levy, Roger)
October 2, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Rose Beale on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Beale, Elana)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: granting #127 Motion for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/01/2019) (ama)
September 27, 2019 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 26, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hasan Shafiqullah on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Shafiqullah, Hasan)
September 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #127 MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #124 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/24/2019) (ks)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #123 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/24/2019) (ks)
September 23, 2019 Filing 124 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated September 23, 2019. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 123 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan Hurwitz dated September 23rd, 2019. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #122 MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 122 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward) Modified on 9/23/2019 (wb).
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #121 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 121 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny) Modified on 9/20/2019 (wb).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #117 Motion for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2019) (cf)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #118 Motion for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/20/2019) (cf)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #118 MOTION for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION for Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #117 MOTION for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632322. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Susan M. Krumplitsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17632322. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Krumplitsch, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Susan, Krumplitsch)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici the American Academy of Pediatrics, the American Medical Association, the American College of Physicians, and the New York State American Academy of Pediatrics' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 106), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/18/2019) (jca) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jca).
September 17, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, New York State American Academy of Pediatrics. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennelly, Kaitland)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (jca)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part #99 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' time to file an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 12:00 pm on September 27, 2019. Plaintiffs' time to file any reply to Defendants' opposition is due by 12:00 pm on October 4, 2019. Oral argument will be held on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on October 7, 2019 at 10:00 am. The initial conference scheduled for September 24, 2019 at 10:30 am is canceled. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 9/27/2019, Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jca)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #103 Motion for Brittany N. Lovejoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (ks)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE terminating #69 Motion for Kristyn M. DeFillipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #96 Motion for Kristyn M. DeFillipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jwh)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #102 MOTION for Sadik H. Huseny to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jca)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #106 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward, and California Immigrant Policy Center's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 106), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (ks)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #105 MOTION for Tess L. Curet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jca)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #104 Motion for Alexandra B. Plutshack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/16/2019) (jwh)
September 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #102 MOTION for Sadik H. Huseny to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #104 MOTION for Alexandra B. Plutshack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601480. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #103 MOTION for Brittany N. Lovejoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601472. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #105 MOTION for Tess L. Curet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 14, 2019 Filing 107 PROPOSED BRIEF re: #106 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Sadik Huseny dated September 13, 2019. - Proposed Amicus Brief. Document filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Huseny, Sadik)
September 13, 2019 Filing 106 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Sadik Huseny dated September 13, 2019. Document filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy.(Huseny, Sadik)
September 13, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for Tess L. Curet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601488. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tess L. Curet in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Curet, Tess)
September 13, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for Alexandra B. Plutshack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601480. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexandra B. Plutshack in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Plutshack, Alexandra)
September 13, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Brittany N. Lovejoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601472. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brittany N. Lovejoy in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lovejoy, Brittany)
September 13, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Sadik H. Huseny to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17601392. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward, California Immigrant Policy Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sadik H. Huseny in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik)
September 13, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Victor Haohan Yu on behalf of NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;. New Address: KEKER, VAN NEST & PETERS, 633 BATTERY STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, United States 94911, 4153915400. (Yu, Victor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 100 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan Hurwitz dated September 13, 2019 re: #99 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua Kolsky dated September 13, 2019. . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 99 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua Kolsky dated September 13, 2019. Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Kolsky, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #89 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association, Disability Rights New York and New York Civil Liberties Union's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 89), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #90 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici the National Housing Law Project, the Food Research & Action Center, the Center for Law and Social Policy, and the other Housing, Nutrition, and Health-Focused Groups' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 90), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #96 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #77 Motion for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #86 Motion for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #87 Motion for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #88 Motion for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/2019) (jwh)
September 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #88 MOTION for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #87 MOTION for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #86 MOTION for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #91 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 13, 2019 Filing 91 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;. Related Document Number: #90 . (Yu, Victor) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 13, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief)(Yu, Victor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 89 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Sarah M. Ray dated September 12, 2019. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Ray, Sarah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Charles Ferer Sprague to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Ferer Sprague in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sprague, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Kyle A. Virgien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle A. Virgien in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Virgien, Kyle)
September 12, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Sarah M. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17592956. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights New York, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, New York Civil Liberties Union, The Arc of United States, United Spinal Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah M. Ray in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Sarah)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #73 Motion for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (kv)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #75 Motion to File Amicus Brief: Upon consideration of amici Health Law Advocates, Health Care For All, the Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Northeastern University's Center for Health Policy and Law, Public Health Law Watch, and Health in Justice Action Lab, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, the Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, the California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, the California Immigrant Policy Center, the Kentucky Equal Justice Center, the Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, the Florida Health Justice Project, the Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, the New York Immigration Coalition, Community Healthcare Network, the Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Treatment Action Group, Families USA, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., and Community Catalyst's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 75), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (jwh)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #74 Motion for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (kv)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #71 Motion for Wendy E. Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rjm)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #70 Motion for Justin J. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rjm)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #76 Letter, filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney Steven Craig Herzog terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rro)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #72 Motion for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rjm)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #68 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici Members of Congress Judy Chu, Chair of the CAP AC, Adriano Espaillat, CHC Whip, Yvette D. Clarke, Chair of the CBC Immigration Task Force, Joaquin Castro, Chair of the CHC, Karen Bass, Chair of the CBC, Pramila Jayapal, Chair of the CAPAC Immigration Task Force, Barbara Lee, Co-Chair of the CAPAC Healthcare Task Force, et al.'s motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 68), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/12/2019) (rro)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17587804. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 12, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Regan Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17587804. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Regan)
September 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #70 MOTION for Justin Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583930. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #74 MOTION for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #69 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583852. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #73 MOTION for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #71 MOTION for Wendy Ellen Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #72 MOTION for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 76 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Steven C. Herzog dated September 11, 2019 re: Requesting to be Removed from the Docket. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Herzog, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Emily Joanne Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584043. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Andrew London to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Andrew Paul Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17584011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Wendy Ellen Parmet to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Justin Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583930. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Kristyn Marie DeFilipp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17583852. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Health Law Advocates et al.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFilipp, Kristyn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Congressional Tri-Caucus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: granting #59 Motion for Leave to File Document. Upon consideration of amici Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, and PHI's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 59), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (ama)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #62 Letter Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici Asian Americans Advancing Justice, AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, National Women's Law Center, and 57 other organizations' motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 62), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (ama)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. Upon consideration of amici Deans, Chairs, and Scholars; the American Public Health Association; and the American Academy of Nursing's motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 54), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So ordered. Granting #54 Motion to File Amicus Brief. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/2019) (rjm)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #57 Motion for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Owen T. Masters for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/19) (yv)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Christopher J. Frisina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Christopher J. Frisina for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Frisina is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/11/19) (yv)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #58 MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #57 MOTION for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER MOTION to File Amicus Brief addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jared A. Levine, Esq. dated 9/10/2019. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed amicus brief)(Levine, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Elise Li on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Li, Anne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center. (Levine, Jared)
September 10, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae . Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hirschhorn, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 58 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Denny Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576471. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Denny) Modified on 9/11/2019 (wb).
September 10, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Owen T. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17576321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masters, Owen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Laurence Hirschhorn on behalf of Justice in Aging, American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, MAZON, PHI. (Hirschhorn, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Elizabeth Welber on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Welber, Susan)
September 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Christopher J. Frisina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17572890. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #53 MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17573094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #52 MOTION for Phillip A. Escoriaza to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17573044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of New York, Puerto Rico, Virginia and Connecticut;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward)
September 10, 2019 Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Edward T. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17573094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward) Modified on 9/10/2019 (wb).
September 10, 2019 Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Phillip A. Escoriaza to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17573044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escoriaza, Phillip) Modified on 9/10/2019 (wb).
September 10, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Christopher J. Frisina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17572890. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deans, Chairs, and Scholars, American Public Health Association, American Academy of Nursing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frisina, Christopher)
September 10, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Robert J. O'Loughlin in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Final Rule, #2 Exhibit 2-Article, #3 Exhibit 3-Article, #4 Exhibit 4-Article, #5 Exhibit 5-NPRM, #6 Exhibit 6-Bill, #7 Exhibit 7-Bill, #8 Exhibit 8-Bill Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9-Debate Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 10-Comment, #11 Exhibit 11-Table, #12 Exhibit 12-Yearbook, #13 Exhibit 13-Book Excerpts, #14 Exhibit 14-Article, #15 Exhibit 15-Article, #16 Exhibit 16-Report Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17-Report Excerpts, #18 Exhibit 18-Bill Excerpts, #19 Exhibit 19-Bill Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 20-Comment, #21 Exhibit 21-Bill Excerpts, #22 Exhibit 22-Debate Excerpts, #23 Exhibit 23-Report Excerpts, #24 Exhibit 24-Debate Excerpts, #25 Exhibit 25-Bill Excerpts, #26 Exhibit 26-Field Guidance, #27 Exhibit 27-Proposed Regulation, #28 Exhibit 28-Article, #29 Exhibit 29-Comment, #30 Exhibit 30-Article, #31 Exhibit 31-Article, #32 Exhibit 32-Article, #33 Exhibit 33-Memorandum, #34 Exhibit 34-Emails, #35 Exhibit 35-Emails, #36 Exhibit 36-Bill, #37 Exhibit 37-Comment, #38 Exhibit 38-I-944 Form, #39 Exhibit 39-Article, #40 Exhibit 40-Article, #41 Exhibit 41-Article, #42 Exhibit 42-Article, #43 Exhibit 43-Economic Analysis, #44 Exhibit 44-Regulatory Impact Analysis, #45 Exhibit 45-E.Bay Santuary Covenant V. Barr)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Haeyoung Yoon in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Charles Wheeler in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comment)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jo-Ann Yoo in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comment)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Kim Nichols in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comment)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Van Hook, Ph.D. in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Figures and Tables, #2 Exhibit B - Publications, #3 Exhibit C - CV)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION of C. Mario Russell in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comment)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Theo Oshiro in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comment)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Leighton Ku, Ph.D., M.P.H. in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Ryan Allen, Ph.D. in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CV, #2 Exhibit B - Tables)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Diane Schanzenbach, Ph.D. in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CV)(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #41 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Ryan Allen in Support re: #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CV, #2 Exhibit B - Tables)(Herzog, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2019 (db).
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #40 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Diane Schanzenbach, Ph.D. in Support re: #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CV)(Herzog, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2019 (db).
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #39 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Herzog, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2019 (db).
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #38 Motion) - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Herzog, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2019 (db).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The page limit for Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 40 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (jca)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of their motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 40 pages. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/6/2019) (tro)
September 6, 2019 Filing 31 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joshua M. Kolsky dated September 6, 2019 re: #29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan H. Hurwitz dated September 5, 2019. . Document filed by Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Kolsky on behalf of Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jonathan H. Hurwitz dated September 5, 2019. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been designated an electronic case and has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are required to promptly register as filing "USERS" in accordance with the procedure for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to attend a conference at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures, and to furnish chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Tuesday, September 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/5/19) (yv)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
September 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07777-GBD. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad)
September 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany Thomas on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Thomas, Brittany)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Mary Kelleher on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Kelleher, Kathleen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Joan Cameron on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Cameron, Susan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ken Cuccinelli. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (O'Loughlin, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Shiah Sinnreich on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Sinnreich, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew James Ehrlich on behalf of African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 19cv7777. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Catholic Charities, Archdiocese of New York for Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York). Document filed by Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York).(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Asian American Federation.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by African Services Committee.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Make the Road New York.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin K. McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ken Cuccinelli, in his official capacity as Acting Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-07777 (GBD). Document filed by African Services Committee, Asian American Federation, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York.(Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17497324)Document filed by Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Asian American Federation, African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Hurwitz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Make the Road New York et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York)
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian American Federation
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: African Services Committee
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Elana Rose Beale
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Hasan Shafiqullah
Represented By: Robert Joseph O'Loughlin, III
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Kelleher
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Steven Craig Herzog
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Congressional Tri-Caucus
Represented By: Caroline Herman Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Nursing
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York State American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Kaitland Mccann Kennelly
Represented By: Krumplitsch Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;
Represented By: Victor Haohan Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Health Law Advocates et al.
Represented By: Kristyn DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Roger A Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny Chan
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Represented By: Phillip A Escoriaza
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Council on Independent Living
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center
Represented By: Anne Elise Li
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Center for Public Representation
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mental Health America
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Disability Rights Network
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kids Forward
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fiscal Policy Institute
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Arc of United States
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United Spinal Association
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Association of University Centers on Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: American Association of People with Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Little Lobbyists
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Disability Rights New York
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Charles F. Sprague
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California Immigrant Policy Center
Represented By: Tess L. Curet
Represented By: Alexandra B. Plutshack
Represented By: Brittany N. Lovejoy
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?