Mullaney v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Laura Mullaney
Defendant: sean monahan, Kaeron David, CITY OF NEW YORK, Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Theodore E. Federoff, Miguele Amoresano, New York City Police Department, Daniel Gagliardi, Benjamin Gottlieb, Sergeant Daniel J. Gagliardi, Sergeant Kaeron David, Sergeant Sean M. Monahan, Sergeant Miguele A. Amoresano, Deputy Inspector Theodore E. Federoff, Lieutenant Benjamin Gottlieb, Captain Lourdes Soto and City of New York Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv07996
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Yee Coyne on behalf of City Of New York, City of New York Police Department. (Coyne, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (dnh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Danilo Bandovic to RE-FILE Document No. #22 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before New York City Law Department. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel J. Gagliardi. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Theodore E. Federoff. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean M. Monahan. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Gottlieb(dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miguele A. Amoresano(dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PATROLMEN'S BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/26/2019 (dnh).
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel J. Gagliardi, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Theodore E. Federoff, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean M. Monahan, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/26/2019 (dnh).
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean M. Monahan, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Gottlieb, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miguele A. Amoresano, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Danilo Bandovic to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party names. 'As to' Error; the defendant name listed in the as to docket entry must exactly match the defendant name listed in the 'To:' section of the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Danilo Bandovic. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Police Department. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York Police Department . (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lourdes Soto. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kaeron David. (dnh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Theodore Federoff, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Monahan, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York Police Department, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miguele Amoresano, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lourdes Soto, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kaeron David, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Gottlieb, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Gagliardi, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #3 Complaint,,. Document filed by Laura Mullaney. (Bandovic, Danilo) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Miguele A. Amoresano(in their official capacity), Miguele A. Amoresano(Individually), City Of New York, Kaeron David(in their official capacity), Kaeron David(Individually), Theodore E. Federoff(Individually), Theodore E. Federoff(in their official capacity), Daniel J. Gagliardi(Individually), Daniel J. Gagliardi(in their official capacity), Benjamin Gottlieb(in their official capacity), Benjamin Gottlieb(Individually), Sean M. Monahan(Individually), Sean M. Monahan(in their official capacity), Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, New York City Police Department, Lourdes Soto(individually), Lourdes Soto(in their official capacity). Document filed by Laura Mullaney.(Bandovic, Danilo)
August 28, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Lourdes Soto, Lourdes Soto, Benjamin Gottlieb, Kaeron David, Miguele A. Amoresano, Sean M. Monahan, Theodore E. Federoff, Daniel J. Gagliardi added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Laura Mullaney. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Bandovic, Danilo)
August 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Danilo Bandovic. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code m (Mandatory);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (pc)
August 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Danilo Bandovic to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Captain Lourdes Soto twice to CM ECF, once with the party text "individually" and once with the party text "in their official capacity". Add Miguele A. Amoresano, Kaeron David, Theodore E. Federoff, Daniel J. Gagliardi, Benjamin Gottlieb, Sean M. Monahan with the party text "in their official capacity" for each. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) Modified on 8/28/2019 (pc).
August 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Danilo Bandovic. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Miguele Amoresano, CITY OF NEW YORK, Kaeron David, Theodore E. Federoff, Daniel Gagliardi, Benjamin Gottlieb, sean monahan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bandovic, Danilo)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguele Amoresano, CITY OF NEW YORK, Kaeron David, Theodore E. Federoff, Daniel Gagliardi, Benjamin Gottlieb, Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, New York City Police Department, sean monahan. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17498472)Document filed by Laura Mullaney.(Bandovic, Danilo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullaney v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sean monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaeron David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Christopher John Yee Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore E. Federoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguele Amoresano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Daniel J. Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Kaeron David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Sean M. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Miguele A. Amoresano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Inspector Theodore E. Federoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Benjamin Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Lourdes Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York Police Department
Represented By: Christopher John Yee Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Mullaney
Represented By: Danilo Bandovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?