Liu v. Dicarlo et al
Plaintiff: Feng Liu
Defendant: Other Law Enforcement Officer(s) of FBI and United States of America, Frank Dicarlo and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv08031
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Other Law Enforcement Officer(s) of FBI and United States of America served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Service was accepted by Osricta Gordon - Clerk. Document filed by Feng Liu. (nb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Feng Liu, at 9013 69th Avenue Forest Hills, NY 11375, on 9/17/2019 Re: #5 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
September 17, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 9/17/2019 Re: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Federal Bureau of Investigation; The United States Attorney General's Office, SDNY; The United States Attorney General, The United States Department of Justice. (bwa)
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation; The United States Attorney General's Office, SDNY; The United States Attorney General, The United States Department of Justice. (bwa)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Frank DiCarlo and "other law enforcement officer(s) of FBI. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to complete the USM-285 forms with the address for the United States of America, mark the box on the USM-285 forms labeled "Check for service on U.S.A.," and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/16/2019) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
September 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 5, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Feng Liu 9013 69th Avenue Forest Hills, NY 11375. (vba)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/4/2019) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Frank Dicarlo, Other Law Enforcement Officer(s) of FBI and United States of America. Document filed by Feng Liu.(rdz)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Feng Liu.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Dicarlo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Law Enforcement Officer(s) of FBI and United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dicarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feng Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?