Equal Vote America Corp. et al v. McConnell et al
Plaintiff: LEWIS Y LIU, Equal Vote America Corp. and Lewis Y. Liu
Defendant: Mitch McConnell and Charles Grassley
Case Number: 1:2019cv08178
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Charles Grassley served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Mitch McConnell served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp.; Lewis Y. Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Mailings to Defs and USDA of NY Southern District)(Liu, Yu-Xi)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Grassley, Mitch McConnell. (dnh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MITCH McCONNELL, CHARLES GRASSLEY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp., Lewis Y. Liu. (Liu, Yu-Xi)
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MITCH McCONNELL, CHARLES GRASSLEY, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp., Lewis Y. Liu. (Liu, Yu-Xi) Modified on 9/16/2019 (dnh).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/10/2019) (gr)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so redesignated. (wb)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02346-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2403; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Yu-Xi Liu. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yu-Xi Liu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Equal Vote America Corp.; Lewis Y. Liu; Mitch McConnell; Charles Grassley. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Grassley, Mitch McConnell. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17530102)Document filed by Equal Vote America Corp., LEWIS Y LIU. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Full Names and Address of Co-Plaintiffs who have consented to join in this action)(Liu, Yu-Xi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Vote America Corp. et al v. McConnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Grassley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS Y LIU
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Vote America Corp.
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Y. Liu
Represented By: Yu-Xi Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?