Jerusalem v. Capital One Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Gavriel Jerusalem
Defendant: Capital One Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08248
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-cv-02967, filed on 10/24/2019. (sjo)
October 23, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (sjo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/15/2019) (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings and deadlines until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter J. Isajiw dated 9/12/19. Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A. Case stayed pending a decision by the JPML. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/12/2019) (rjm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings and deadlines until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Peter J. Isajiw dated 9/12/19. Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service (upon pro se))(Isajiw, Peter)
September 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 10, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07161-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Warren Gray, Jr on behalf of Capital One Bank N.A.. (Gray, Robert)
September 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1:19-cv-07161-JGK. (dnh)
September 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned and Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, civil cover sheet, related case statement and corporate disclosure statement served on Gavriel Jerusalem, 184 White Road, Jackson, NJ 08527 on 9/4/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A.. (Isajiw, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank N.A.. Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A..(Isajiw, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07161-JGK. Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A..(Isajiw, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Isajiw, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYC Civil Court - Small Claims, County of New York. Case Number: 16425 SCNY 2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17542830).Document filed by Capital One Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Plaintiff to Capital One)(Isajiw, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerusalem v. Capital One Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavriel Jerusalem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank N.A.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?