Spiegel v. Selip & Stylianou, LLP
Plaintiff: Nicole Spiegel and Nicole Atias
Defendant: Selip & Stylianou, LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv08293
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant Selip & Stylianou, LLP may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and includingNovember 11, 2019. (Selip & Stylianou, LLP answer due 11/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/24/2019) (ras)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Alicia S. Bursky-Stillman dated 10/10/2019. Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP.(Selip, Mitchell)
September 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #8 Motion for Jesse S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/26/2019) (ama)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Jesse S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17659428. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicole Spiegel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jesse S. Johnson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jesse)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Selip & Stylianou, LLP served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service was accepted by Joshua Sherer, Attorney. Document filed by Nicole Spiegel. (Weiner, Brittany)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/9/2019) (ks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Omitted Exhibit to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brittany Weiner dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by Nicole Spiegel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibit A to Complaint)(Weiner, Brittany)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Selip & Stylianou, LLP. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brittany Sloane Weiner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nicole Spiegel. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiner, Brittany)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Selip & Stylianou, LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicole Spiegel. (Weiner, Brittany)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selip & Stylianou, LLP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17550753)Document filed by Nicole Spiegel.(Weiner, Brittany) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #1 Exhibit A) (ks).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spiegel v. Selip & Stylianou, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Spiegel
Represented By: Brittany Sloane Weiner
Represented By: Jesse Stine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Atias
Represented By: Brittany Sloane Weiner
Represented By: Jesse Stine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selip & Stylianou, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell Selip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?