Montgomery v. Miranda
Plaintiff: Matthew Montgomery
Defendant: Israel Miranda
Case Number: 1:2019cv08316
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Matthew Montgomery. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lim, Tomas)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tomas Blaquera Lim to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tomas Blaquera Lim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 28758/2019E..Document filed by Israel Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice for Removal, #2 Supplement Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service on Defendant, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendant's Answer and Discovery Demands, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F - Notice of Removal to State Court)(Lim, Tomas)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Tomas Blaquera Lim to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the document filed as attachment No. 1 [Petition for Removal] is the pleading and should be the main document. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** Initial Pleading due by 9/16/2019. (pne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28758/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17555852).Document filed by Israel Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Petition for Removal, #2 Supplement Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer and Discovery Demands, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E - Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F - Notice of Removal to State Court)(Lim, Tomas) Modified on 9/9/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Montgomery
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Miranda
Represented By: Tomas Blaquera Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?