James Domen et al v. Vimeo, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Church United and James Domen
Defendant: Vimeo, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2019cv08418
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: #45 Response in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Higuera, Nada)
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Higuera, Nada)
October 11, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Michael A. Cheah in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cheah, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Cheah, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2019(Cheah, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Elizabeth Baldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Elizabeth Baldridge, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/11/2019) (kl)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Kevin L. Vick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Kevin L. Vick, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/11/2019) (kl)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #36 Motion for Jean-Paul Jassy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jean-Paul Jassy, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/11/2019) (kl)
October 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Kevin L. Vick to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17753083. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Cl, #38 MOTION for Elizabeth Baldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17753120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed, #36 MOTION for Jean-Paul Jassy to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17752897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 10, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Elizabeth Baldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17753120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Baldridge, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Kevin L. Vick to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17753083. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Baldridge, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Jean-Paul Jassy to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17752897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Baldridge, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does, Vimeo, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Domen, Church United. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tyler, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: In light of the parties' consent for this action to proceed before Judge Aaron, the Initial Pretrial Conference before District Judge Torres (see ECF No. 21) is cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/3/2019) (Text Only Order) (kl)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #32 Notice (Other) filed by Vimeo, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019. Motions due by 10/11/2019., Reply to Response to Brief due by 11/15/2019. Responses to Brief due by 11/1/2019) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/2/2019) (js)
October 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Agreed-upon Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re: #1 Complaint - Miscellaneous,. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Cheah, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 31 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/1/2019) (mro)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Nada Nassar Higuera to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
September 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Nada Nassar Higuera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17656181. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Nada Nassar Higuera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17656181. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion Pro hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Higuera, Nada)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Robert Henry Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
September 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Robert Henry Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #26. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 24, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Robert Henry Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #26. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Robert)
September 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 MOTION for Robert Henry Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not except certificates from state bar associations.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Robert Henry Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Tyler, Robert)
September 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for Robert H. Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17627530. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Robert H. Tyler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17627530. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Church United, James Domen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Declaration re Service)(Tyler, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. By October 4, 2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Vimeo, Inc. answer due 10/4/2019 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/18/2019) (cf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint - Miscellaneous, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael A. Cheah dated September 18, 2019. Document filed by Vimeo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cheah, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/13/2019) (cf)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/13/2019) (cf)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. Cheah on behalf of Vimeo, Inc.. (Cheah, Michael)
September 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
September 11, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
September 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 8:19-cv-01278. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter to Southern District of New York (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE #12 . Transferring case to Southern District of New York. Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue is DENIED. Defendants Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York is GRANTED. Case electronically sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 IN CHAMBERS ORDER TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re : MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant #10 and Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue #12 filed by Defendant - The motions are submitted. Orders to issue. The motions previously scheduled for August 19, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. are vacated and off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in support of Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue #12 filed by Defendant Vimeo, Inc.. (Jassy, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or Alternatively, To Transfer Venue; Declaration of James Domen Opposition re: Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue #12 filed by Plaintiffs Church United, James Domen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re Service)(Higuera, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Vimeo, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue #10 (Jassy, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Vimeo, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F) (Jassy, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vimeo, Inc., identifying IAC/InterActiveCorp. (Jassy, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Vimeo, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F) (Attorney Jean-Paul Jassy added to party Vimeo, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Jassy, Jean-Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff James Domen, Church United, upon Defendant Vimeo, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Higuera, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Vimeo, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Church United, a California not-for-profit corporation, James Domen. (Higuera, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 * CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES * filed as NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Church United, a California not-for-profit corporation, James Domen. (Higuera, Nada) Modified on 6/26/2019 (esa). [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Church United, a California not-for-profit corporation, James Domen. (Higuera, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23981263 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs James Domen, Church United, a California not-for-profit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Nada Nassar Higuera added to party Church United, a California not-for-profit corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Nada Nassar Higuera added to party James Domen(pty:pla))(Higuera, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Domen et al v. Vimeo, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church United
Represented By: Nada Nassar Higuera
Represented By: Robert H Tyler
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Domen
Represented By: Nada Nassar Higuera
Represented By: Robert H Tyler
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimeo, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin L Vick
Represented By: Michael A. Cheah
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Represented By: Elizabeth Holland Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?