Rung et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Christopher J Rung
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv08422
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:19-cv-07130, filed on 10/30/2019. (sjo)
October 23, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/17/2019) (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Company. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Suffolk; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Michelle K. Rung. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. (jgo) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jgo).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jgo).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monsanto Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher J Rung. (Rheingold, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17579806)Document filed by Christopher J Rung.(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rung et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Rung
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?