Shanker v. Malkin
Plaintiff: IYER SHANKER
Defendant: KEITH RICHARD MALKIN as Personal Representative of the Estate of STANLEY LEE MALKIN (deceased)
Case Number: 1:2019cv08425
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 11/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp)
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Huggard Shields. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Huggard Shields to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The pleading must indicate the District Court. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/17/2019. (jgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17580223)Document filed by IYER SHANKER.(Shields, John) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanker v. Malkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH RICHARD MALKIN as Personal Representative of the Estate of STANLEY LEE MALKIN (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IYER SHANKER
Represented By: John Huggard Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?