J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Vasquez et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Defendant: Eugenia J Vasquez, Eugenia Josefina Vasquez and El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08440
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Eugenia J Vasquez served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Service was accepted by Aidan Para (a person of suitable age and discretion). Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist of the NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eugenia J Vasquez. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc.. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eugenia J Vasquez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc., Eugenia J Vasquez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17581340)Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Vasquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia J Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Josefina Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El 1298 Gran Valle Restaurant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?