J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Peralta et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Defendant: Andrea Peralta, Carol Enterprises Inc. and Lola Lola Bar
Case Number: 1:2019cv08444
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Robert Hunter to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Proposed Default Judgment,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): final paragraph in the liquidated amount of $_________ with (?Prejudment) interest at the _______% (?Per Annum), from ________, (in the amount of $__________) Should be added, plus costs and disbursemtns, etc., etc.,. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Default Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers. (dt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/5/2019 (dt).
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Robert B Hunter re: #17 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief . Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph M. Gagliardi re: #17 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief . Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #17 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief . Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Andrea Peralta, individually and d/b/a Lola Lola a/k/a Lola Lola Bar & Restaurant. (km)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Carol Enterprises Inc., an unknown business entity d/b/a Lola Lola a/k/a Lola Lola Bar & Restaurant. (km)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Robert B Hunter re: #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, #12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default . Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Sevice)(Hunter, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
October 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/31/2019, ( Default Hearing set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert B. Hunter on behalf of J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hunter, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Andrea Peralta served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. Service was accepted by Frank Duran. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Carol Enterprises Inc. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist of the NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/3/2019) (kgo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carol Enterprises Inc.. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Peralta. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carol Enterprises Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea Peralta, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carol Enterprises Inc., Andrea Peralta. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17581895)Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Peralta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lola Lola Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Represented By: Robert B. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?