Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rachel L Bailey
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv08472
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:17-cv-6404. (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Arizona; Case Number: 2:16-cv-00600. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Southern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #7 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169269 as to Jaime E Moss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169268 as to Jennifer A Lenze. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169267 as to Laurie E Kamerrer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Laurie Kamerrer on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer A Lenze on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jaime E Moss on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-600-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX169272 filed by Rachel L Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel L Bailey
Represented By: Jennifer A Lenze
Represented By: Jaime E Moss
Represented By: Laurie E Kamerrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?