Russell et al v. South Shore Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Albert John Alonzo Lyons, Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons and Destiny Nicole Russell
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD., Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC and SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08494
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. South Shore Furniture served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service was accepted by Marie-Pierre Martin, Financial Controller. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
November 6, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. South Shore Industries Ltd. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service was accepted by Marie-Pierre Martin, Financial Controller. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
November 6, 2019 Filing 34 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons), Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"), Destiny Nicole Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Rodriguez, Francisco)
November 6, 2019 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., f/k/a "Wal-Mart Stores, Inc." for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC; Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc..(Haworth, Scott)
November 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth to RE-FILE Document #27 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons), Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"), Destiny Nicole Russell(Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand served on plaintiffs on October 25, 2019. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Haworth, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Scott Haworth, Esq. on behalf of all defendants in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Summons and Verified Complaint 8.13.19 and Amended Summons and Complaint 8.14.19, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- So-Ordered Stip Ext Time to Answer 9.22.19, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Plaintiff's Appearance of Counsel 9.30.19, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Stip to Extend time to Answer 10.17.19, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- FILED Verified Answer to Amended Verified Complaint)(Haworth, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Verified Answer to Amended Verified Complaint served on plaintiffs on October 25, 2019. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Haworth, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc..(Haworth, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WMT for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc..(Haworth, Scott) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ldi).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for defendants, that the time within which defendants may Answer, move or otherwise plead in response to plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 25, 2019. So Ordered. (South Shore Furniture answer due 10/25/2019; South Shore Industries Ltd. answer due 10/25/2019; South Shore USA, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart TRS, LLC answer due 10/25/2019; Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC answer due 10/25/2019; Walmart, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019.) Motions terminated: #25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott Haworth dated October 17, 2019. filed by South Shore Industries Ltd., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., South Shore Furniture, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., South Shore USA, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/18/2019) (rro)
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott Haworth dated October 17, 2019. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead)(Haworth, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Scott Haworth dated October 14, 2019 re: amendment to removal. Document filed by South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc..(Haworth, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Lawrence Haworth on behalf of South Shore Furniture, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Haworth, Scott)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand . Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons), Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"), Destiny Nicole Russell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. South Shore USA, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by ERROR: document_type record selection error. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. South Shore Industries Ltd. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by ERROR: document_type record selection error. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. South Shore Furniture served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Antonio Yzaguirre. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by John Doe. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Walmart, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart TRS, LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service was accepted by Pat Flake. Document filed by Destiny Nicole Russell ; Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons); Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"); Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francisco J Rodriguez on behalf of Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons), Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"), Destiny Nicole Russell. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for defendants, that the time within which defendants may Answer, move or otherwise plead in response to plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 18, 2019. The parties are directed to ensure that any subsequent requests for adjournment or extension of time comply with Rule 1(G) of my Individual Rules & Practices in Civil Cases, which requires that such requests be made in a letter-motion, stating the following: (1) the original due date; (2) the number of previous requests for adjournments or extensions of time; (3) whether these previous requests were granted or denied; (4) whether the adversary consents and, if not, the reasons given by the adversary for refusing to consent; and (5) the specific reasons for the adjournment or extension of time. SO ORDERED., South Shore Furniture answer due 10/18/2019; South Shore Industries Ltd. answer due 10/18/2019; South Shore USA, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart TRS, LLC answer due 10/18/2019; Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC answer due 10/18/2019; Walmart, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/22/2019) (ama)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc.. (Haworth, Scott)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 2165-1153 Quebec Inc. for South Shore Industries Ltd.. Document filed by South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc..(Haworth, Scott)
September 17, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons(as Administrator of the Estate of Lorelei E. Lyons a/k/a Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons), Albert John Alonzo Lyons("individually"), Destiny Nicole Russell, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart, Inc., 2165-1153 Quebec Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.(Haworth, Scott)
September 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haworth, Scott)
September 13, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,.(Haworth, Scott)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; if all party names do not fit in the space provided, name the first party on each side followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Destiny Nicole Russell, Destiny Nicole Russell, Albert John Alonzo Lyons, South Shore Industries Ltd., South Shore USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Albert John Alonzo Lyons must be added to the case a second time, with party text "individually". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS WITH THIS EVENT*** (pne)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Lawrence Haworth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (pne)
September 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Notice of Removal; (ii) Civil Cover Sheet; (iii) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement; (iv) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (NYSCEF) and (v) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (SDNY) served on all plaintiffs and co-defendants on September 12, 2019. Service was made by ECF and Regular Mail. Document filed by SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD., SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.. (Haworth, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of FILED Notice of Filing Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,. Document filed by SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD., SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 FILED Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Haworth, Scott)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD., SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.(Haworth, Scott) Modified on 9/17/2019 (ldi).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haworth, Scott) Modified on 9/13/2019 (pne).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 157921-2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17589399).Document filed by SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD., SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint and Amended Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Texas Office of the Comptroller Corporate Records for South Shore USA Inc., #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Canadas Business Registries Corporate Records for South Shore Industries Ltd., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State of New York Corporate Records, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - State of New York Corporate Records for Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC)(Haworth, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. South Shore Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart TRS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH SHORE INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH SHORE USA, INC.
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert John Alonzo Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorelei Elizabeth Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Nicole Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?