Jobe v. Cheeks III
Plaintiff: YUSHUPA JOBE
Defendant: HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III and Babbert Lee Cheeks III
Case Number: 1:2019cv08518
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441tm
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Discovery pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) shall be exchanged by 10/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2020. Plaintiffs deposition shall be taken first, and shall be completed by 1/7/2020. Defendant's deposition shall be completed by 1/9/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2019. The parties may at any time consent to have this case tried before the assigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/23/2019) (mml)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Habbert Lee Cheeks III. (Fallon, Connor)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Goodstein on behalf of Yushupa Jobe. (Goodstein, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (kv)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Yushupa Jobe.(Goodstein, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosure served on Pollack, Pollack, Isaac & DeCicco, LLP on 09-17-19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Habbert Lee Cheeks III. (Fallon, Connor)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Habbert Lee Cheeks III. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Police Report)(Fallon, Connor)
September 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (wb)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Connor William Fallon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yushupa Jobe; Habbert Lee Cheeks III. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Connor William Fallon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal of Action and Civil Cover Sheet served on Pollack, Pollack, Isaac & DeCicco, LLP on 09-13-19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III. (Fallon, Connor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fallon, Connor)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 25233/2019E..Document filed by HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Demand for Statement of Damages, #3 Exhibit Stipulation)(Fallon, Connor)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Connor William Fallon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/18/2019. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet & Petition for Federal Removal served on Pollack, Pollack, Isaac & DeCicco, LLP on 09-13-19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III. (Fallon, Connor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PETITION REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17591370).Document filed by HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Petition for Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand for Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Stipulation and Related Emails)(Fallon, Connor) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jobe v. Cheeks III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HABBERT LEE CHEEKS III
Represented By: Connor William Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babbert Lee Cheeks III
Represented By: Connor William Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUSHUPA JOBE
Represented By: Matthew Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?