Galvez et al v. 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Alexander Hernandez Vicente, Eugenio Luna Reyes and Salvador Galvez Garcia
Defendant: 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. d/b/a Ginza Japanese Restaurant, Xiu Lan Huang, Chun Yong Chen and 800 Ginza Sushi Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08549
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 800 Ginza Sushi Inc..(Liu, Keli)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #19 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, against 800 Ginza Sushi Inc., Chun Yong Chen, Xiu Lan Huang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Placido Galvez Narvaez. Related document: #19 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hope Allison Pordy to RE-FILE Document No. #19 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Select parties listed on the pleading caption only. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against 800 Ginza Sushi Inc., Chun Yong Chen, Xiu Lan Huang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Vicente Galindo. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope) Modified on 10/21/2019 (jgo).
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Hope Pordy dated October 18, 2019 re: Filing of Amended Complaint. Document filed by Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Alexander Hernandez Vicente.(Pordy, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer on behalf of Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Alexander Hernandez Vicente. (Sprotzer, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Chun Yong Chen served on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. Service was accepted by Chun Yong Chen, Defendant. Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente; Eugenio Luna Reyes; Salvador Galvez Garcia; Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez; Placido Galvez Narvaez; Vicente Galindo. (Pordy, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service was accepted by Chun Yong Chen, Managing Agent. Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente; Eugenio Luna Reyes; Salvador Galvez Garcia; Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez; Placido Galvez Narvaez; Vicente Galindo. (Pordy, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. So Ordered. 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. answer due 11/18/2019; Chun Yong Chen answer due 11/18/2019; Xiu Lan Huang answer due 11/18/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/2/2019) (js)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Xiu Lan Huang served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. Service was accepted by Chun Yong Chen, co-worker. Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente; Eugenio Luna Reyes; Salvador Galvez Garcia; Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez; Placido Galvez Narvaez; Vicente Galindo. (Pordy, Hope)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, December 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/2/2019) (js)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Keli Liu dated 10/1/2019. Document filed by 800 Ginza Sushi Inc., Chun Yong Chen, Xiu Lan Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Stipulation)(Liu, Keli)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keli Liu on behalf of 800 Ginza Sushi Inc., Chun Yong Chen, Xiu Lan Huang. (Liu, Keli)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/17/2019) (jwh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Xiu Lan Huang. (pc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 800 Ginza Sushi Inc.. (pc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chun Yong Chen. (pc)
September 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hope Allison Pordy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. d/b/a Ginza Japanese Restaurant. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Xiu Lan Huang, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Alexander Hernandez Vicente. (Pordy, Hope)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chun Yong Chen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Alexander Hernandez Vicente. (Pordy, Hope)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. d/b/a Ginza Japanese Restaurant, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Vicente Galindo, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Alexander Hernandez Vicente. (Pordy, Hope)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pordy, Hope)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. d/b/a Ginza Japanese Restaurant, Chun Yong Chen, Xiu Lan Huang. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17599849)Document filed by Alexander Hernandez Vicente, Eugenio Luna Reyes, Salvador Galvez Garcia, Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez, Placido Galvez Narvaez, Vicente Galindo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pordy, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez et al v. 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Galindo
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gelasio Espinobarros Galvez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Placido Galvez Narvaez
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Hernandez Vicente
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Luna Reyes
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Galvez Garcia
Represented By: Hope Allison Pordy
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 800 Ginza Sushi Inc. d/b/a Ginza Japanese Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiu Lan Huang
Represented By: Keli Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chun Yong Chen
Represented By: Keli Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 800 Ginza Sushi Inc.
Represented By: Keli Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?