Gentry v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Rodney Gentry
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08580
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7275 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF) Letter Dismissal of Economic Loss Claims in Newly Consolidated Cases Pursuant to Order No. 50 filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/16/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(yv)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for December 12, 2019, is hereby ADJOURNED to December 18, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. EST. Counsel shall promptly update the MDL website accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/8/2019) ( Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ks)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on September 30, 2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, ECF No. 1. As this case, Gentry v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-8580, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-08580-JMF(ne)
September 18, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (ne)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 18, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 14-md-2543. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the earlier filed case caption was omitted on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment - no selection. The proper Courthouse must be selected pursuant to the related case Judge referral. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dwyer, Alexander)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to General Motors LLC. Document filed by Rodney Gentry. (Dwyer, Alexander)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of Rodney Gentry re: that this action be filed as related to 14-md-02543. Document filed by Rodney Gentry.(Dwyer, Alexander) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jgo).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dwyer, Alexander) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jgo).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17606001)Document filed by Rodney Gentry.(Dwyer, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Gentry
Represented By: Alexander Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?