Rothbart v. Central Marketing Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Ellen Rothbart
Defendant: Central Marketing Services Inc. and Central Markeing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08619
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/18/2019) (jwh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Marketing Services Inc.. (jgo)
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Abrams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Central Marketing Services Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Marketing Services Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Rothbart. (Abrams, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abrams, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Marketing Services Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17611658)Document filed by Ellen Rothbart.(Abrams, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothbart v. Central Marketing Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Rothbart
Represented By: David Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Marketing Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Markeing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?