Edouard v. Orlando
Plaintiff: Henold Edouard
Defendant: Vason Orlando
Case Number: 1:2019cv08630
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE CANCELLATION: In light of the Consent of Jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge having been filed on 11/1/2019, the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 3:30 pm before Judge Katherine Polk Failla is cancelled. (tn)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Henold Edouard, Vason Orlando. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/1/2019) (rro)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/15/2019) (rro)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey L. Koenig on behalf of Henold Edouard. (Koenig, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Notice of Service of Jury Demand re: #4 Jury Demand. Document filed by Vason Orlando. (Cotignola, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Vason Orlando(Cotignola, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael N Cotignola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vason Orlando.(Cotignola, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cotignola, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 26588/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17614773).Document filed by Vason Orlando. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Demand for Amount of Damages Alleged, #4 Exhibit Response to Demand for Amount of Damages Alleged)(Cotignola, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edouard v. Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vason Orlando
Represented By: Michael N Cotignola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henold Edouard
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?