Rowe v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Ulku Rowe
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08655
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Proposed Schedule addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Cara E. Greene dated November 15, 2019. Document filed by Ulku Rowe.(Greene, Cara)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Dorothy Brown on behalf of Google LLC. (Brown, Caitlin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth William Gage on behalf of Google LLC. (Gage, Kenneth)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order as soon as possible, and in any event no later than November 18, 2019 at 10 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2019) (cf)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/7/2019) (cf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Google LLC waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. Document filed by Ulku Rowe. (Greene, Cara)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google LLC. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cara Elizabeth Greene. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,001,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000. (dnh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Google LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ulku Rowe. (Greene, Cara)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Greene, Cara)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17617580)Document filed by Ulku Rowe.(Greene, Cara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Caitlin Dorothy Brown
Represented By: Kenneth William Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulku Rowe
Represented By: Cara Elizabeth Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?