Omdahl v. Farfetch Limited et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Omdahl
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Michael Risman, Jose Neves, Elliot Jordan, Allen & Company LLC, Daniel Rimer, Dana Evan, Natalie Massenet, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, David Rosenblatt, UBS Securities LLC, Richard Liu, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Frederic Court, Farfetch Limited, Cowen and Company, LLC, Jonathan Kamaluddin and Jonathan Newhouse
Case Number: 1:2019cv08657
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for all parties that, notwithstanding anything to the contrary in Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is suspended pending appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC"); and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Defendants are not required to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; 2. Within 60 days of the entry of an order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff shall file a CAC; 3. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the CAC within 60 days after the filing of the CAC; 4. If Defendants move to dismiss the CAC, lead plaintiff shall file its opposition within 60 days after the filing of any motion to dismiss; 5. Defendants shall file and serve their reply to any opposition made by lead plaintiff within 30 days after the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition; and 6. The initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, January 24, 2020 at 3:30 pm is adjourned. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/12/19) (yv)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt.(Hegt, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Craig Hegt on behalf of Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Hegt, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeff G. Hammel on behalf of Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Hammel, Jeff)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeff G. Hammel dated November 7, 2019 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Orders regarding various scheduling matters. Document filed by Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Hammel, Jeff)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, January 24, 2020 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the patties are hereby ORDERED to ECF file a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order no later than seven days prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules (available at the Court's website, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan) forthwith. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. (Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/1/19) (yv)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Frederic Court, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farfetch Limited, Jose Neves, Elliot Jordan, Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeff Omdahl. (Portnoy, Lesley)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each summons request must be filed as a separate event. One Summons may be issued to multiple parties by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jeff Omdahl. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farfetch Limited, Jose Neves, Elliot Jordan, Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Allen & Company LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Cowen and Company, LLC, and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jeff Omdahl. (Portnoy, Lesley) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dnh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Frederic Court, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17617650)Document filed by Jeff Omdahl.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omdahl v. Farfetch Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Risman
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Neves
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Jordan
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rimer
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Evan
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Massenet
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rosenblatt
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Liu
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic Court
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farfetch Limited
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kamaluddin
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Newhouse
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Omdahl
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?