City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan v. Farfetch Limited et al
Plaintiff: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Allen & Company LLC, Michael Risman, Jose Neves, Elliot Jordan, Daniel Rimer, Dana Evan, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, David Rosenblatt, UBS Securities LLC, Richard Liu, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Frederic Court, Farfetch Limited, Cowen and Company, LLC, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Dame Natalie Massenet and Jonathan Newhouse
Case Number: 1:2019cv08720
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted Minute Entry of January 21, 2020. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (Landers, Rigoberto)
November 18, 2019 Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent EVEREN Capital Corporation for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC; Corporate Parent Cowen Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC for Allen & Company LLC; Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G., Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Corporate Parent JPMorgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Holdings LLC for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC ; Corporate Parent BNP Paribas US Wholesale Holdings, Corp., Corporate Parent BNP Paribas USA, Inc., Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp.; Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC.(Cosenza, Todd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Jane Eaton on behalf of Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Eaton, Mary)
November 18, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd G. Cosenza on behalf of Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Cosenza, Todd)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for all parties that, notwithstanding anything to the contrary in Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is suspended pending appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC"); and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: 1. Defendants are not required to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; 2. Within 60 days of the entry of an order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff shall file a CAC; 3. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the CAC within 60 days after the filing of the CAC; 4. If Defendants move to dismiss the CAC, lead plaintiff shall file its opposition within 60 days after the filing of any motion to dismiss; 5. Defendants shall file and serve their reply to any opposition made by lead plaintiff within 30 days after the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition; and 6. The initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, January 24, 2020 at 3:30 pm is adjourned. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/12/19) (yv)
November 7, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeff G. Hammel on behalf of Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Hammel, Jeff)
November 7, 2019 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt.(Hegt, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Craig Hegt on behalf of Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Hegt, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jeff G. Hammel dated November 7, 2019 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Orders regarding various scheduling matters. Document filed by Frederic Court, Dana Evan, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Hammel, Jeff)
November 6, 2019 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Rosenblatt waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Risman waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Daniel Rimer waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan Newhouse waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jose Neves waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Natalie Massenet waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard Liu waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan Kamaluddin waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Elliot Jordan waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Farfetch Limited waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dana Evan waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
November 6, 2019 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Frederic Court waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2019) (kv)
September 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 25, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08657-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farfetch Limited. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Neves. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elliot Jordan. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frederic Court. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dana Evan. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Kamaluddin. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Liu. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Natalie Massenet. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Newhouse. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Rimer. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Risman. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Rosenblatt. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allen & Company LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UBS Securities LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cowen and Company, LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (sj)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 1:19cv8657. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-08657-AJN. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan.(Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cowen and Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allen & Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Rosenblatt, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Risman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Rimer, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Newhouse, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dame Natalie Massenet, DBE, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Liu, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Kamaluddin, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dana Evan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frederic Court, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elliot Jordan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Neves, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farfetch Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amjed, Naumon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Frederic Court, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dana Evan, Farfetch Limited, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Elliot Jordan, Jonathan Kamaluddin, Richard Liu, Natalie Massenet, Jose Neves, Jonathan Newhouse, Daniel Rimer, Michael Risman, David Rosenblatt, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17629840)Document filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan.(Amjed, Naumon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan v. Farfetch Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Risman
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Neves
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Jordan
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rimer
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Evan
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rosenblatt
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Liu
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic Court
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farfetch Limited
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Todd G. Cosenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kamaluddin
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dame Natalie Massenet
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Newhouse
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Jason Craig Hegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Retirement Plan
Represented By: Naumon A Amjed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?