Tagliareni v. Bronczek et al
Plaintiff: Salvatore Tagliareni
Defendant: Rajesh Subramaniam, Marvin R. Ellison, Paul S. Walsh, John C. Inglis, David L. Cunningham, Kimberly A. Jabal, David J. Bronczek, Susan C. Schwab, Donald F. Colleran, Brad Martin, John A. Edwardson, Frederick W. Smith, Michael C. Lenz, James L. Barksdale, Alan B. Graf, Jr., Joshua Cooper Ramo, Shirley Ann Jackson and David P. Steiner
Nominal Defendant: Fedex Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv08723
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(A)(1): ACCORDINGLY, Plaintiff hereby voluntarily this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/23/2019) (ama)
October 23, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) James L. Barksdale, David J. Bronczek, Donald F. Colleran, David L. Cunningham, John A. Edwardson, Marvin R. Ellison, Fedex Corporation, Alan B. Graf, Jr., John C. Inglis, Kimberly A. Jabal, Shirley Ann Jackson, Michael C. Lenz, Brad Martin, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Susan C. Schwab, Frederick W. Smith, David P. Steiner, Rajesh Subramaniam, Paul S. Walsh. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Levine, Mark)
October 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Ronnie Abrams for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a shareholder derivative action. (dt)
October 22, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-05990-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fedex Corporation. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan C. Schwab. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shirley Ann Jackson. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rajesh Subramaniam. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul S. Walsh. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael C. Lenz. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marvin R. Ellison. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kimberly A. Jabal. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Cooper Ramo. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John C. Inglis. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John A. Edwardson. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James L. Barksdale. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frederick W. Smith. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald F. Colleran. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David P. Steiner. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David L. Cunningham. (gp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David J. Bronczek. (gp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FedEx Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan C. Schwab, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shirley Ann Jackson, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rajesh Subramaniam, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul S. Walsh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael C. Lenz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marvin R. Ellison, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kimberly A. Jabal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua Cooper Ramo, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John C. Inglis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John A. Edwardson, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James L. Barksdale Summons, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frederick W. Smith, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald F. Colleran, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David P. Steiner, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David L. Cunningham, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David J. Bronczek, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni. (Levine, Mark)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 19CV5990. (pne)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Levine. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Salvatore Tagliareni. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Levine. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:1109; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78; the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-05990. Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni.(Levine, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Levine, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James L. Barksdale, David J. Bronczek, Donald F. Colleran, David L. Cunningham, John A. Edwardson, Marvin R. Ellison, Fedex Corporation, Alan B. Graf, Jr., John C. Inglis, Kimberly A. Jabal, Shirley Ann Jackson, Michael C. Lenz, Brad Martin, Joshua Cooper Ramo, Susan C. Schwab, Frederick W. Smith, David P. Steiner, Rajesh Subramaniam, Paul S. Walsh. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17630345)Document filed by Salvatore Tagliareni.(Levine, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagliareni v. Bronczek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Subramaniam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin R. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Inglis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Jabal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Bronczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Colleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Edwardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Barksdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B. Graf, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cooper Ramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Tagliareni
Represented By: Mark Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?