Integro USA, Inc. v. Crain et al
Petitioner: Integro USA, Inc.
Respondent: Peter Lavery, Eileen Flaherty, Anne Chang, Joanne Wankmiller, Alexander Heide, Debra Goddeau, William McDonough, Ethan Crain, Gary Neal Wallace, Eva Gee and Diana Alessandrini
Case Number: 1:2019cv08752
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:4
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
November 18, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #30 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Alexander Heide, Anne Chang, Debra Goddeau, Diana Alessandrini, Eileen Flaherty, Ethan Crain, Eva Gee, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller, Peter Lavery, William McDonough against Integro USA, Inc. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated November 14, 2019, Integro's petition for a preliminary injunction in aid of arbitration is DENIED as to the misappropriation of trade secrets claims. It is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the remaining contract law claims; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 11/18/2019) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(km)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER. Accordingly, the interests of judicial economy and comity are served by the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining claims. For the foregoing reasons, Integro's petition for a preliminary injunction in aid of arbitration is DENIED as to the misappropriation of trade secrets claims. It is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the remaining contract law claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 29 and to close the case. SO ORDERED. re: #29 LETTER MOTION to Expedite and Supplement Record addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Steven D. Pearson dated 10/07/2019. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/14/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION to Expedite and Supplement Record addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Steven D. Pearson dated 10/07/2019. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc..(Pearson, Steven)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of First Supplemental Declaration of Marc Kunney in Support. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Pearson, Steven)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of First Supplemental Declaration of Peter Kohler in Support. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Pearson, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Clifford R. Atlas in Opposition re: #17 Reply, #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Atlas, Clifford)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #17 Reply, #1 Petition (Other) Respondents' Sur-Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Opposition To Petitioner's Petition For A Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Atlas, Clifford)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/23/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/23/2019 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. RESPONDENTS ARE HEREBY GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY NOT TO EXCEED EIGHT (8) PAGES ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (el)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Clifford R. Atlas dated 10-1-2019. Document filed by Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller.(Atlas, Clifford)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard T. Kienzler on behalf of Integro USA, Inc.. (Kienzler, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Denise Walsh re: #14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuntive Relief Pending Arbitration. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY re: #14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuntive Relief Pending Arbitration. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Pearson, Steven)
September 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Richard T. Kienzler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17677779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Richard T. Kienzler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17677779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc..(Costigan, Andrew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Clifford R. Atlas in Opposition re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Atlas, Clifford)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 Petition (Other) (RESPONDENTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER). Document filed by Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Atlas, Clifford)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Brett Levin on behalf of Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Levin, Jason)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ravindra Kumar Shaw on behalf of Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Shaw, Ravindra)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Atlas on behalf of Diana Alessandrini, Anne Chang, Ethan Crain, Eileen Flaherty, Eva Gee, Debra Goddeau, Alexander Heide, Peter Lavery, William McDonough, Gary Neal Wallace, Joanne Wankmiller. (Atlas, Clifford)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Dale Pearson, Sr on behalf of Integro USA, Inc.. (Pearson, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
September 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Steven D. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17639700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Steven D. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17639700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven D. Pearson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Costigan, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of (1) September 20, 2019 Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief Pending Arbitration; (2) September 20, 2019 Declaration of Steven D. Pearson in Support of Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief Pending Arbitration and Exhibits 1-25 referenced therein; (3) September 20, 2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief Pending Arbitration; (4) September 20, 2019 Order of Hon. Jesse S. Furman; (5) Rule 7.1 Statement; and (6) Civil Cover Sheet served on Ethan Crain, William McDonough, Joanne Wankmiller, Diana Alessandrini, Gary Neal Wallace, Eileen Flaherty, Anne Chang, Debra Goddeau, Peter Lavery, Alexander Heide and Eva Gee on September 20, 2019. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Costigan, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Steven D. Pearson in Support re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Costigan, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition (Other) . Document filed by Integro USA, Inc.. (Costigan, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Integro USA, Inc..(Costigan, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall appear for a conference before Judge Oetken (the presiding Judge) on September 23, 2019, at 2:30 pm, in Courtroom 706 of 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, to address Plaintiff's application for injunctive relief. No later than midnight tonight, Plaintiff shall (1) file all papers submitted in support of its application on ECF; (2) serve copies of those papers on all Defendants by e-mail to their last known e-mail addresses and by overnight courier (Saturday delivery) to their last known addresses; and (3) file proof of such service. (Status Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman Part I on 9/20/2019) (ne)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) (pne).
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PENDING ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401244622).Document filed by Integro USA, Inc..(jgo) (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integro USA, Inc. v. Crain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Integro USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Costigan
Represented By: Richard T. Kienzler
Represented By: Steven Dale Pearson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Lavery
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eileen Flaherty
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anne Chang
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joanne Wankmiller
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alexander Heide
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra Goddeau
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William McDonough
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ethan Crain
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Neal Wallace
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eva Gee
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diana Alessandrini
Represented By: Jason Brett Levin
Represented By: Clifford Atlas
Represented By: Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?