Amelio v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clemente Amelio and Alfonso Amelio
Defendant: Mcabe, Wesiburg & Conway, P.C., Quicken Loans, Inc., Onewest Bank, FSB and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv08761
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Alfonso Amelio, Clemente Amelio, at 60 W. 23rd Street Apt. 830 New York, NY 10010, on 10/25/2019 Re: #5 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 9 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (bwa)
October 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concrete Properties, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fein, Such & Crane LLP, Mcabe, Wesiburg & Conway, P.C., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, OneWest Bank, FSB, Quicken Loans, Inc., Seterus, Inc.. (bwa)
October 22, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 ORDER OF SERVICE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rro)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Quicken Loans, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association, McCabe, Weisburg & Conway, P.C., Fein, Such & Crane LLP, Seterus, Inc., Concrete Properties, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and One West Bank, FSB. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/22/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 10/29/2019 (rro). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/29/2019) (rro).
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending #2 Complaint against Concrete Properties, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fein, Such & Crane LLP, Mcabe, Wesiburg & Conway, P.C., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, OneWest Bank, FSB, Quicken Loans, Inc., Seterus, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Clemente Amelio, Alfonso Amelio, Carmine Amelio. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc)
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, Mcabe, Wesiburg & Conway, P.C., Onewest Bank, FSB, Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401244634)Document filed by Alfonso Amelio, Clemente Amelio.(rdz)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amelio v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mcabe, Wesiburg & Conway, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemente Amelio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Amelio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?