Oncay et al v. Inflasafe USA, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Oncay and Karen Oncay
Defendant: Inflasafe USA, Inc, Rufus Casey, US Airbag, LLC, Great Air, Inc, Bounce Back, LLC and Seekjoy Productions LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08765
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (cf)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #27 Motion to Transfer Case. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2019) (cf) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case Application For Transfer of Venue. Document filed by Great Air, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Transfer Venue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mead, Erin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiffs on 11/7/2019. Service was made by electronic filing. Document filed by Great Air, Inc. (Thorn, Arthur)
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Henry Thorn on behalf of Great Air, Inc. (Thorn, Arthur)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Great Air, Inc.(Mead, Erin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Weinstein,Zimmerman & Ohlinger on November 6,2019. Document filed by Great Air, Inc. (Mead, Erin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #3 Complaint., ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #3 Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Great Air, Inc.(Mead, Erin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Great Air, Inc.(Mead, Erin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter filed by Great Air, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant must seek leave from the Court under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(1)(b) to extend its time to answer. This letter is construed as such an application. The application is untimely but is nevertheless granted nunc pro tunc. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 6, 2019. The parties are reminded to be mindful of all applicable procedural rules moving forward. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to docket this order at No. 19-cv-8765. Great Air, Inc answer due 11/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/4/2019) (cf)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Erin Mead dated November 1, 2019 re: Letter to plaintiff confirming extension to answer. Document filed by Great Air, Inc.(George, Erin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Patricia George, Ms on behalf of Great Air, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(George, Erin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Great Air, Inc served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service was accepted by Brandon Field, Officer. Document filed by Karen Oncay; Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/7/2019) (kv)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Airbag, LLC. (jgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seekjoy Productions LLC. (jgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rufus Casey. (jgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inflasafe USA, Inc. (jgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Great Air, Inc. (jgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bounce Back, LLC. (jgo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to US Airbag LLC, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Seekjoy Productions LLC, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rufus Casey, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inflasafe USA, Inc., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Great Air Inc., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bounce Back, LLC, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Bounce Back, LLC, Rufus Casey, Great Air, Inc, Inflasafe USA, Inc, Seekjoy Productions LLC, US Airbag, LLC. Document filed by Karen Oncay, Raymond Oncay.(Ohliger, Jason)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ohliger, Jason)
September 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jason Robert Ohliger. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Robert Ohliger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Raymond Oncay, Inflasafe USA, Inc, Bounce Back, LLC, US Airbag, LLC, Seekjoy Productions LLC, Great Air, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17637063)Document filed by Karen Oncay.(Ohliger, Jason) Modified on 9/23/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oncay et al v. Inflasafe USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Oncay
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Oncay
Represented By: Jason Robert Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inflasafe USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rufus Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airbag, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Air, Inc
Represented By: Arthur Henry Thorn
Represented By: Erin Patricia Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bounce Back, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seekjoy Productions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?