Mont et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Mont and Dionesy Vargas
Defendant: Det. Michael Dye, City of New York, P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10, P.O. Shannon Myers and Lt. Thomas Fabrizi
Case Number: 1:2019cv08770
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Michael Dye served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019; Shannon Myers served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service was accepted by P.O. "John" Mirabello. Document filed by Shannon Mont; Dionesy Vargas. (Weber, Rose)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference, joint request. The application is granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 16, 2020 is adjourned to April 9, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2019) (jca)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference , joint request, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joshua Levin dated 10/11/2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Levin, Joshua)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Michael Levin on behalf of City of New York. (Levin, Joshua)
October 6, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. Thomas Fabrizi served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service was accepted by Sgt. "John" Lopez. Document filed by Shannon Mont; Dionesy Vargas. (Weber, Rose)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/1/2019) (jca)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. City of New York served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by Shannon Mont; Dionesy Vargas. (Weber, Rose)
September 24, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents City of New York, John and Jane Doe #1-10, Michael Dye, Thomas Fabrizi, Shannon Myers, John and Jane Doe #1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Shannon Mont, Dionesy Vargas. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Weber, Rose)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Michael Dye, Thomas Fabrizi, Shannon Myers. (pc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
September 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rose Minna Weber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rose Minna Weber re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10 to CM ECF with the party text "in their official capacities, (the names John and Jane Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
September 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weber, Rose)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, DET. MICHAEL DYE, LT. THOMAS FABRIZI, P.O. SHANNON MYERS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shannon Mont, Dionesy Vargas. (Weber, Rose)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe #1-10, Michael Dye, Thomas Fabrizi, Shannon Myers. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17637295)Document filed by Shannon Mont, Dionesy Vargas.(Weber, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mont et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Michael Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Joshua Michael Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O.s John and Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Shannon Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Thomas Fabrizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Mont
Represented By: Rose Minna Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionesy Vargas
Represented By: Rose Minna Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?