Bright Kids NYC, Inc. et al v. Kabbage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Monsour II, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Mike's Auton Service, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., PIM SalonsLLC D/B/A Beautiful Brands, Julie Cox, Marcia Van Camp, IB Olsen, Bige Doruk, DBR Construction, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC, Michael L. Pederson, PIM Salons, LLC and Mike's Auto Service, Inc.
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc., Robert Frohwein and Kathryn Petralia
Case Number: 1:2019cv09221
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Nathan L. Garroway to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Jeffrey Allen Zachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Nathan L. Garroway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18065952. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Jeffrey Allen Zachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18065800. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Nathan L. Garroway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18065952. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Letter of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Garroway, Nathan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Jeffrey Allen Zachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18065800. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Letter of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zachman, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia.(Margolis, Justine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justine Margolis on behalf of Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia. (Margolis, Justine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dov Ber Medinets on behalf of Bige Doruk, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., IB Olsen. (Medinets, Dov)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference dated 10/7/2019 served on Nathan L. Garroway on 10/14/2019. Service was accepted by Nathan L. Garroway. Document filed by Bige Doruk, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Julie Cox, DBR Construction, IB Olsen, Mike's Auto Service, Inc., Theodore Monsour II, PIM Salons, LLC, Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC. (Heskin, Shane)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Frohwein waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Kabbage, Inc. waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Kathryn Petralia waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. Document filed by Michael L. Pederson; The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC; Bige Doruk; PIM Salons, LLC; DBR Construction ; Theodore Monsour II; Bright Kids Chicago, Inc.; Marcia Van Camp; Bright Kids NYC, Inc.; IB Olsen; Julie Cox; Mike's Auto Service, Inc.. (Heskin, Shane)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathryn Petralia. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Frohwein. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kabbage, Inc.. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathryn Petralia, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bige Doruk, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Julie Cox, DBR Construction, IB Olsen, Mike's Auto Service, Inc., Theodore Monsour II, PIM Salons, LLC, Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC. (Heskin, Shane)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Frohwein, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bige Doruk, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Julie Cox, DBR Construction, IB Olsen, Mike's Auto Service, Inc., Theodore Monsour II, PIM Salons, LLC, Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC. (Heskin, Shane)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kabbage, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bige Doruk, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Bright Kids NYC, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Julie Cox, DBR Construction, IB Olsen, Mike's Auto Service, Inc., Theodore Monsour II, PIM Salons, LLC, Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC. (Heskin, Shane)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Parties/Addesses)(Heskin, Shane)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 17, 2019 at 4:00 pm in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/7/19) (yv)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shane R. Heskin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia, Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC, Bige Doruk, PIM Salons, LLC, DBR Construction, Theodore Monsour II, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Bright Kids NYC, Inc., IB Olsen, Julie Cox, Mike's Auto Service, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Shane R. Heskin. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
October 7, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17721116, paid on 10/4/2019. (pne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Frohwein, Kabbage, Inc., Kathryn Petralia. Document filed by Michael L. Pederson, The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC, Bige Doruk, PIM SalonsLLC D/B/A Beautiful Brands, DBR Construction, Theodore Monsour II, Bright Kids Chicago, Inc., Marcia Van Camp, Bright Kids NYC, Inc., IB Olsen, Julie Cox, Mike's Auton Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Heskin, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright Kids NYC, Inc. et al v. Kabbage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Monsour II
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Kids Chicago, Inc.
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Represented By: Dov Ber Medinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike's Auton Service, Inc.
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Kids NYC, Inc.
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Represented By: Dov Ber Medinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIM SalonsLLC D/B/A Beautiful Brands
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Cox
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Van Camp
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IB Olsen
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Represented By: Dov Ber Medinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bige Doruk
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Represented By: Dov Ber Medinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBR Construction
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cedars of Lebanon, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Pederson
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIM Salons, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike's Auto Service, Inc.
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabbage, Inc.
Represented By: Justine Margolis
Represented By: Jeffrey Zachman
Represented By: Nathan L Garroway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Frohwein
Represented By: Justine Margolis
Represented By: Jeffrey Zachman
Represented By: Nathan L Garroway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Petralia
Represented By: Justine Margolis
Represented By: Jeffrey Zachman
Represented By: Nathan L Garroway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?